This case was last updated from PACER on 03/20/2021 at 08:03:02 (UTC).

Roe v. Surgical Care Affiliates, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Roe filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Surgical Care Affiliates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrea R. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00305

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrea R. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rhonda Roe

Allen Spradling

Defendants

Surgical Care Affiliates, LLC

Scai Holdings, LLC

John Does

United Healthgroup Inc.

Intervenor

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher B Sanchez

Attorney at Nussbaum Law Group, P.C.

1211 Avenue Of The Americas, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10036-8718

Gary M. Klinger

Attorney at Mason Lietz & Klinger LLP

227 W. Monroe Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60606

Karen Halbert

Attorney at Roberts Law Firm, P.A.

20 Rahling Circle

Little Rock, AR 72223

Michael L. Roberts

Attorney at Roberts Law Firm, P.A.

Post Office Box 241790

Little Rock, AR 72223-1790

Linda P. Nussbaum

Attorney at Nussbaum Law Group, P.C.

1211 Avenue Of The Americas, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10036-8718

David K. Lietz

Attorney at Mason Lietz & Klinger Llp

5101 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Suite 305

Washington, DC 20016

Morgan Hunt

Attorney at Roberts Law Firm

20 Rahling Circle

Little Rock, AR 72223

William Rolf Olson

Attorney at Roberts Law Firm US, PC

20 Rahling Circle

Little Rock, AR 72223

Gary Edward Mason

Attorney at Mason Lietz & Klinger LLP

5101 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Suite 305

Washington, DC 20016

Ashley C Keller

Attorney at Keller Lenkner LLC

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4270

Chicago, IL 60606

Travis D. Lenkner

Attorney at Keller Lenkner LLC

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4270

Chicago, IL 60606

Jason A. Zweig

Attorney at Keller Lenkner LLC

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4270

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel E. Laytin

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Catie Ventura

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

James H. Mutchnik

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Intervenor Attorney

Anthony William Mariano

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

450 5Th Street Nw, #4608

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) STATUS Report for Initial Status Conference by Rhonda Roe (Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#31

(#31) MOTION by Attorney William R. Olson to withdraw as attorney for Rhonda Roe. No party information provided (Olson, William) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

30 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#30

(#30) MOTION by Intervenor United States of America to intervene , MOTION by Intervenor United States of America to stay (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mariano, Anthony) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#29

(#29) ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor United States of America by Anthony William Mariano (Mariano, Anthony) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#28

(#28) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Allen Spradling by Ashley C Keller (Keller, Ashley) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

25 #4

Exhibit D - Roe Docket

25 #3

Exhibit C - Roe Complaint

25 #2

Exhibit B - Spradling Docket

25 #1

Exhibit A - Spradling Complaint

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rhonda Roe by David K. Lietz (Lietz, David) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion by counsel for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#6

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion by counsel for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rhonda Roe by Gary Edward Mason (Mason, Gary) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status conference set for 3/25/2021 at 9:30 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rhonda Roe by Christopher B Sanchez (Sanchez, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sanchez, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint filed by Rhonda Roe; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17840895.(Sanchez, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) STATUS Report for Initial Status Conference by Rhonda Roe (Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION by Attorney William R. Olson to withdraw as attorney for Rhonda Roe. No party information provided (Olson, William) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION by Intervenor United States of America to intervene , MOTION by Intervenor United States of America to stay (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mariano, Anthony) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor United States of America by Anthony William Mariano (Mariano, Anthony) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Allen Spradling by Ashley C Keller (Keller, Ashley) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE by Defendants Scai Holdings, LLC, Surgical Care Affiliates, LLC, United Healthgroup Inc. to motion to reassign case, #25 Pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 (Laytin, Daniel) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Allen Spradling by Travis D. Lenkner (Lenkner, Travis) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION by Plaintiff Allen Spradling to reassign case Pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Spradling Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Spradling Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Roe Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Roe Docket)(Zweig, Jason) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Allen Spradling by Jason A. Zweig (Zweig, Jason) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION by Plaintiff Rhonda Roe to consolidate cases , MOTION by Plaintiff Rhonda Roe for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dean Harvey, #2 Declaration of Linda Nussbaum, #3 Declaration of Mike Roberts, #4 Declaration of Stephanie Scharf, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rhonda Roe by David K. Lietz (Lietz, David) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion by counsel for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17888010. (Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rhonda Roe by Gary Edward Mason (Mason, Gary) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status conference set for 3/25/2021 at 9:30 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Scai Holdings, LLC, Surgical Care Affiliates, LLC, United Healthgroup Inc. (sxh, ) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rhonda Roe by Christopher B Sanchez (Sanchez, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sanchez, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint filed by Rhonda Roe; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17840895.(Sanchez, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scai Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTH GROUP AND ASSOCIATES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony William Mariano