This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2021 at 10:36:01 (UTC).

Roe 1818 v. Bishop of Charleston, The et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 Roe 1818 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bishop of Charleston, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Roe 1818

Defendant

Bishop of Charleston, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anna Elizabeth Richter

Attorney at Richter Firm LLC

622 Johnnie Dodds Boulevard

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Lawrence Edward Richter, Jr

Attorney at Richter Firm

622 Johnnie Dodds Boulevard

Mt Pleasant, SC 29464

Defendant Attorneys

Richard S Dukes, Jr

Attorney at Turner Padget Graham and Laney

Po Box 22129, 40 Calhoun Street, Suite 200

Charleston, SC 29413-2129

Megan Rudd

Attorney at Turner Padget Graham and Laney

Po Box 1509

Greenville, SC 29602

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

10 #9

Exhibit Order denying Defs' motion for partial summary judgment (Roe)

10 #8

Exhibit Order denying Defs' motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doe)

10 #7

Exhibit Transcript of Record 7.17.19

10 #6

Exhibit Settlement Agreement in Class Action case

10 #5

Exhibit Limited Warranty Deed

10 #4

Exhibit Diocese Defs' Omnibus Motion for Summary Judgment

10 #3

Exhibit Complaint in 2014-CP-10-1283

10 #2

Exhibit Orders denying Motions to Dismiss in Doe and Roe

10 #1

Exhibit Motions to Dismiss in Doe and Roe (page 1)

#10

9 #1

Memo in Support

#9

8 #1

Memo in Support to Dismiss Bishop of Charleston, in his Official Capacity

#8

#7

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: The Bishop of the Diocese of Charleston, in his Official Capacity's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 9) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/3/21.(ltap, ) Modified on 3/3/2021 to edit docket text "Signed by", remove "Entered at the Direction of"(sshe, ). (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Dioceses motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 8) is DENIED. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/1/21.(ltap, ) Modified on 3/1/2021 to edit docket text, remove "TEXT" and "Entered at the Direction of" from ORDER (sshe, ). (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Bishop of Charleston, The(in His Official Capacity), Bishop of Charleston, The(a Corporation Sole). (Rudd, Megan) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Mary Roe 1818.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/16/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motions to Dismiss in Doe and Roe (page 1), #2 Exhibit Orders denying Motions to Dismiss in Doe and Roe, #3 Exhibit Complaint in 2014-CP-10-1283, #4 Exhibit Diocese Defs' Omnibus Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit Limited Warranty Deed, #6 Exhibit Settlement Agreement in Class Action case, #7 Exhibit Transcript of Record 7.17.19, #8 Exhibit Order denying Defs' motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doe), #9 Exhibit Order denying Defs' motion for partial summary judgment (Roe))(Richter, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Bishop of Charleston, The(a Corporation Sole). Response to Motion due by 2/9/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Dukes, Richard) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss by Bishop of Charleston, The(in His Official Capacity). Response to Motion due by 2/9/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support to Dismiss Bishop of Charleston, in his Official Capacity)No proposed order.(Dukes, Richard) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mary Roe 1818.(Richter, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Roe 1818. Bishop of Charleston, The(in His Official Capacity) served on 1/5/2021, answer due 1/26/2021.(Richter, Lawrence) Filing corrected for event type with corrected signature document as provided by filing user (sshe, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Roe 1818. Bishop of Charleston, The(a Corporation Sole) served on 1/5/2021, answer due 1/26/2021.(Richter, Lawrence) Filing corrected for event type with corrected signature document as provided by filing user (sshe, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Rudd on behalf of Bishop of Charleston, The(in His Official Capacity), Bishop of Charleston, The(a Corporation Sole) (Rudd, Megan) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bishop of Charleston, The(in His Official Capacity), Bishop of Charleston, The(a Corporation Sole).(sshe, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 21-CP-10-00011. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9566263), filed by Bishop of Charleston, The(in His Official Capacity), Bishop of Charleston, The(a Corporation Sole). (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Richard S. Dukes)(sshe, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2021: #3 Exhibit A to Complaint filed in State Court, #4 Exhibit B to Complaint filed in State Court, #5 Exhibit Verification of plaintiff) (sshe, ). Modified on 1/14/2021 to add additional documents inadvertently not filed as requested and provided by filing user(sshe, ). (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bishop of Charleston, The is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard S Dukes, Jr(Designation Retained)