This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2020 at 09:23:55 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Rodriguez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Wonderful Pistachios Almonds LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ramon E. Reyes, Jr and Frederic Block. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03433

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ramon E. Reyes, Jr

Presiding Judge

Frederic Block

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angel Rodriguez

Defendant

Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dan Shaked

Attorney at Shaked Law Group, P.C.

14 Harwood Court, Suite 415

Scarsdale, NY 10583

Defendant Attorneys

Johnny Traboulsi

Attorney at Roll Law Group PC

11444 West Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Leah Johannesson

Attorney at Roll Law Group PC

11444 W Olympic Blvd, Ste 7Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Gregory Scot Lisi

Attorney at Forchelli Curto Deegan Schwartz Mineo & Terrana, LLP

333 Earle Ovington Blvd, Suite 1010

Uniondale, NY 11553

Michael Andrew Berger

Attorney at Forchelli Deegan Terrana LLP

333 Earle Ovington Blvd, Suite 1010

Uniondale, NY 11553

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Shaked, Dan) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Traboulsi on behalf of Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC (aty to be noticed) (Traboulsi, Johnny) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

11 #1

Affidavit

#11

(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13312402. by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Johannesson, Leah) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

10 #1

Affidavit

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Video Initial Conference set for 9/15/2020 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The attorneys are directed to appear via video and all other participates may join by phone using the Toll number: 1 917-933-2166 and Conference ID: 935 312 706#. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 9/10/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 8/26/2020. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Andrew Berger on behalf of Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC (aty to be noticed) (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Scot Lisi on behalf of Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC (aty to be noticed) (Lisi, Gregory) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13137831 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Angel Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Shaked, Dan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr.: Initial Conference Hearing held on 9/15/2020. Appearances: Dan Shaked, Esq. for Plaintiff; Johnny Traboulsi, Esq. and Leah Johannesson, Esq. for Defendant. Discussions held. The parties' #14 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT is approved. Video Status Conference set for 12/15/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. All discovery due by 3/15/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. A Microsoft Teams Meeting invitation for the scheduled Video Status Conference will be sent to the attorneys' email addresses listed on the docket. (Microsoft Teams Log #12:31:00-12:47:00) (Meyer, Elise) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Shaked, Dan) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Leah Johannesson on behalf of Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Johannesson, Leah) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Traboulsi on behalf of Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC (aty to be noticed) (Traboulsi, Johnny) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/3/2020. (Reyes, Ramon) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/3/2020. (Reyes, Ramon) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13312402. by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Johannesson, Leah) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13312369. by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Johannesson, Leah) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Video Initial Conference set for 9/15/2020 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The attorneys are directed to appear via video and all other participates may join by phone using the Toll number: 1 917-933-2166 and Conference ID: 935 312 706#. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 9/10/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 8/26/2020. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Andrew Berger on behalf of Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC (aty to be noticed) (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Scot Lisi on behalf of Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC (aty to be noticed) (Lisi, Gregory) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13137831 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Angel Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Shaked, Dan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Andrew Berger