This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 08:32:24 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Wilson

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Rodriguez filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Wilson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas E Rogers, III and Joseph F Anderson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03392

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas E Rogers, III

Presiding Judge

Joseph F Anderson, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lazaro Rodriguez

Edgefield, SC 29824

Respondent

Mr. Wilson

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Envelope

#5

(#5) PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 1/24/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 1/02/2020. (dsto, ) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Lazaro Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(dsto, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Supporting Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Lazaro Rodriguez. Response to Motion due by 1/27/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) No proposed order. Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(gnan ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #5 Proper Form Order w/NEF and AO240, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Lazaro Rodriguez, #39023-179, EFCI, PO Box 725, Edgefield, SC, 29824 (dsto, ) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 1/24/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 1/02/2020. (dsto, ) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket(#2) TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Anderson/Greenwood. (dsto, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Lazaro Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(dsto, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less