This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2021 at 07:18:16 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. That's How We Roll LLC

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Rodriguez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against That's How We Roll LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are LaShann DeArcy Hall and Peggy Kuo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05224

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LaShann DeArcy Hall

Referral Judge

Peggy Kuo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angel Rodriguez

Defendant

That's How We Roll LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dan Shaked

Attorney at Shaked Law Group, P.C.

14 Harwood Court, Suite 415

Scarsdale, NY 10583

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan Glenn Kortmansky

Attorney at Salans Hertzfeld Heilbronn Christy & Vie

620 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to That's How We Roll LLC. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held by telephone in this case on December 17, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.)Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By December 10, 2021, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that Defendant is aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 9/21/2021. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by That's How We Roll LLC. (Kortmansky, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant That's How We Roll LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to November 24, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/21/2021. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by That's How We Roll LLC. (Kortmansky, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held by telephone in this case on December 17, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.)Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By December 10, 2021, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that Defendant is aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 9/21/2021. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to That's How We Roll LLC. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against That's How We Roll LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14852452 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Angel Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Shaked, Dan) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less