This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2020 at 07:04:15 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Teleflora LLC

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 Rodriguez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Teleflora LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Orenstein and Kiyo A. Matsumoto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01179

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James Orenstein

Presiding Judge

Kiyo A. Matsumoto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angel Rodriguez

Defendant

Teleflora LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dan Shaked

Attorney at Shaked Law Group, P.C.

14 Harwood Court, Suite 415

Scarsdale, NY 10583

Defendant Attorneys

Leah Johannesson

Attorney at Roll Law Group PC

11444 W Olympic Blvd, Ste 7Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Johnny Traboulsi

Attorney at Roll Law Group PC

11444 West Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Gregory Scot Lisi

Attorney at Forchelli Curto Deegan Schwartz Mineo & Terrana, LLP

333 Earle Ovington Blvd, Suite 1010

Uniondale, NY 11553

Michael Andrew Berger

Attorney at Forchelli Deegan Terrana LLP

333 Earle Ovington Blvd, Suite 1010

Uniondale, NY 11553

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Traboulsi on behalf of Teleflora LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Traboulsi, Johnny) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Leah Johannesson on behalf of Teleflora LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Johannesson, Leah) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

11 #2

Admission Information

11 #1

Affidavit

#11

(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12729752. by Teleflora LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Admission Information) (Johannesson, Leah) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

10 #2

Certificate of Standing

10 #1

Affidavit

#10

(#10) Notice of MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12729495. by Teleflora LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Standing) (Traboulsi, Johnny) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teleflora LLC (Lisi, Gregory) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Scot Lisi on behalf of Teleflora LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Lisi, Gregory) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#7

(#7) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Teleflora LLC. (Lisi, Gregory) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Andrew Berger on behalf of Teleflora LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Teleflora LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12485180 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Angel Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Shaked, Dan) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Traboulsi on behalf of Teleflora LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Traboulsi, Johnny) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Leah Johannesson on behalf of Teleflora LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Johannesson, Leah) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Leah Johannesson, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By May 6, 2020, Ms. Johannesson shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Johannesson shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Johannesson shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/29/2020. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Johnny Traboulsi, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By May 6, 2020, Mr. Traboulsi shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Traboulsi shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Traboulsi shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/29/2020. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12729752. by Teleflora LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Admission Information) (Johannesson, Leah) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12729495. by Teleflora LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Standing) (Traboulsi, Johnny) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teleflora LLC (Lisi, Gregory) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent. Defendant Teleflora LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by May 4, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/27/2020. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Scot Lisi on behalf of Teleflora LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Lisi, Gregory) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Teleflora LLC. (Lisi, Gregory) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Andrew Berger on behalf of Teleflora LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Teleflora LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Teleflora LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12485180 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Angel Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Shaked, Dan) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Teleflora LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dan Shaked