This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/11/2021 at 11:03:13 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Rodriguez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is James R. Nowlin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00243

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Nowlin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pabla Rodriguez

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicolas Lezotte

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS J. HENRY

5710 W Hausman Rd

San Antonio, TX 78248

Defendant Attorneys

Ashley Shapiro Bunyard

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

Michael C Klein

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James R. Nowlin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING Nicolas Lezotte's #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jesus Zuniga on behalf of Nicolas Lezotte ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14655295) by on behalf of Pabla Rodriguez. (Zuniga, Jesus) Modified on 4/1/2021 (jv2). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER directing the removing party to supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#2

(#2) Order Directing Nicolas Lezotte to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

1 #9

Supplement

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14588245), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplement)(Klein, Michael) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James R. Nowlin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING Nicolas Lezotte's #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jesus Zuniga on behalf of Nicolas Lezotte ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14655295) by on behalf of Pabla Rodriguez. (Zuniga, Jesus) Modified on 4/1/2021 (jv2). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER directing the removing party to supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Directing Nicolas Lezotte to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Pabla Rodriguez. (dl) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin. (dl) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14588245), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplement)(Klein, Michael) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant