This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 07:05:27 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Saul

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Rodriguez filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05855

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Molina Rodriguez

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendants

Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rachel Sue Sussman

Attorney at Law Offices of Rachel Sue Sussman

Po Box 460584

San Francisco, CA 94146

Defendant Attorney

In Seon Jeong

Attorney at Social Security Administration

160 Spear St. Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#4

(#4) SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Molina Rodriguez.. (Sussman, Rachel) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew M. Saul.. (Jeong, In Seon) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(#7) Remark: Summons, service packet and related documents emailed to SSA. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/3/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Molina Rodriguez. (Sussman, Rachel) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA. Filed byJames Molina Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sussman, Rachel) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less