Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2020 at 10:10:24 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Putnam Community Medical Center of North Florida, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Rodriguez filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Putnam Community Medical Center of North Florida, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian J. Davis and Joel B. Toomey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01079

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian J. Davis

Referral Judge

Joel B. Toomey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Evelyn Rodriguez

Defendants

Putnam Community Medical Center of North Florida, LLC

Parallon Enterprises, LLC d/b/a HCA Healthcare

Parallon Enterprises, LLC doing business as HCA Healthcare

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul M. Botros

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

8151 Peters Road, Suite 4000

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant Attorneys

Cymoril M. White

Attorney at FordHarrison, LLP

101 E. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 900

Tampa, FL 33602

Tracey K. Jaensch

Attorney at Ford & Harrison, LLP

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33602-5133

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Putnam Community Medical Center of North Florida, LLC identifying Corporate Parent HTI Hospital Holdings, Inc. for Putnam Community Medical Center of North Florida, LLC.. (White, Cymoril) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Putnam Community Medical Center of North Florida, LLC.(Jaensch, Tracey) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Parallon Enterprises, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Parallon Holdings, LLC for Parallon Enterprises, LLC.. (Jaensch, Tracey) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Parallon Enterprises, LLC.(Jaensch, Tracey) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

4 #2

Consent Letter and Form

4 #1

Case Management Report Form

#4

(#4) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Parallon Enterprises, LLC, Putnam Community Medical Center of North Florida, LLC. (KEM) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

1 #3

Proposed Summons Putnam

1 #2

Proposed Summons Parallon

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Parallon Enterprises, LLC d/b/a HCA Healthcare, Putnam Community Medical Center of North Florida, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17351030) filed by Evelyn Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Parallon, #3 Proposed Summons Putnam)(Botros, Paul) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Putnam Community Medical Center of North Florida, LLC identifying Corporate Parent HTI Hospital Holdings, Inc. for Putnam Community Medical Center of North Florida, LLC.. (White, Cymoril) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Putnam Community Medical Center of North Florida, LLC.(Jaensch, Tracey) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Parallon Enterprises, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Parallon Holdings, LLC for Parallon Enterprises, LLC.. (Jaensch, Tracey) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Parallon Enterprises, LLC.(Jaensch, Tracey) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Parallon Enterprises, LLC, Putnam Community Medical Center of North Florida, LLC. (KEM) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:20-cv-1079-J-39JBT. (SJB) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Parallon Enterprises, LLC d/b/a HCA Healthcare, Putnam Community Medical Center of North Florida, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17351030) filed by Evelyn Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Parallon, #3 Proposed Summons Putnam)(Botros, Paul) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARRALLON ENTERPRISES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PUTNAM COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, C/O PROBATE RECOVERY SYSTEMS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tracey Karen Jaensch