This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2020 at 13:16:04 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 Rodriguez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Clare R. Hochhalter and Daniel M. Traynor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00111

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

Presiding Judge

Daniel M. Traynor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hipolito Rodriguez

Defendants

Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC

John Doe

John Doe Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin L. Williams

Jeffrey Scott Weikum

Defendant Attorney

John C. Hughes

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

RESTRICTED

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 2/1/2022 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. (4 days) (JS) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2022 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 4/5/2021. Discovery Motions due by 4/5/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/12/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/17/2021. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 6/14/2021. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 6/14/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 7/12/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 12/15/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 1/11/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 12/15/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/10/2021. (JS) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docket(#6) (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 8/10/2020. (JS) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Stipulation. Filed in error. Clerk's office restricted access to document. (rh) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* STIPULATION Scheduling/Discovery Plan by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Hughes, John) Modified on 8/7/2020 to restrict access. (rh) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Oasis Petroleum LLC, Corporate Parent Oasis Petroleum Inc. for Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC.. (Hughes, John) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Hughes, John) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC from Williams Co. District Court, case number Unknown. Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000836. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less