This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2019 at 07:20:24 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Newmark & Company Real Estate, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Rodriguez filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Newmark Company Real Estate, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laura Taylor Swain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-09607

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laura Taylor Swain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Rodriguez

Defendants

Samuel Gonzalez

Newmark & Company Real Estate, Inc.

GFP Real Estate, LLC

Musart Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Denise K. Bonnaig

Attorney at Bonnaig & Associates

277 Broadway, Suite 708-710

New York, NY 10007

Defendant Attorneys

Ivan D. Smith

Attorney at Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC

640 Fifth Avenue, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Maureen Maria Stampp

Attorney at Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC

640 Fifth Avenue, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10019-6102

Arsenio David Rodriguez

Attorney at Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel, LLP

521 Fifth Avenue, Ste 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10175

Stacey Lynn Pitcher

Attorney at Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP

521 Fifth Avenue, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10175

Dove Ann Elise Burns

Attorney at Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP

360 Lexington Ave. 13Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A - Copy of New York County Supreme Court Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Copy of Affidavit of Service

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 158325/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17789825).Document filed by Musart Associates, LLC, GFP Real Estate, LLC, Samuel Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of New York County Supreme Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Consent of Defendants, #4 Exhibit D - Copy of Agreement)(Smith, Ivan) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Consent of Defendants

1 #4

Exhibit D - Copy of Agreement

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Smith, Ivan) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by GFP Real Estate, LLC.(Smith, Ivan) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Musart Associates, LLC.(Smith, Ivan) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#5

(#7) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Compel Arbitration. . Document filed by GFP Real Estate, LLC, Samuel Gonzalez, Musart Associates, LLC. (Smith, Ivan) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#39

(#39) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Denise K. Bonnaig dated December 6, 2019. Document filed by Michael Rodriguez.(Bonnaig, Denise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#44

(#44) ORDER: granting #39 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page extension request is Granted. DE # 39 resolved. DE # 38 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/06/2019) (ama) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#43

(#43) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Law to Defendants GFP's, Musart's, and Gonzalez's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and In Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand served on All Defendants on December 6, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Michael Rodriguez. (Bonnaig, Denise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#17

(#40) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Remand . and to Defendant Newmark's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Document filed by Michael Rodriguez. (Bonnaig, Denise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#42

(#42) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Remand . and to Defendants GFP's, Musart's, and Gonzalez's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Document filed by Michael Rodriguez. (Bonnaig, Denise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#41

(#41) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Law to Defendant Newmark's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, and In Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand served on All Defendants on December 6, 2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Michael Rodriguez. (Bonnaig, Denise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#40

(#40) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Remand . and to Defendant Newmark's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Document filed by Michael Rodriguez. (Bonnaig, Denise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#38

(#38) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Denise K. Bonnaig dated December 6, 2019. Document filed by Michael Rodriguez.(Bonnaig, Denise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#37

(#37) ORDER: granting #36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The requested extension is Granted. DE # 36 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/27/2019) (ama) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER: granting #39 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page extension request is Granted. DE # 39 resolved. DE # 38 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/06/2019) (ama) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Law to Defendants GFP's, Musart's, and Gonzalez's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and In Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand served on All Defendants on December 6, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Michael Rodriguez. (Bonnaig, Denise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Remand . and to Defendants GFP's, Musart's, and Gonzalez's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Document filed by Michael Rodriguez. (Bonnaig, Denise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Law to Defendant Newmark's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, and In Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand served on All Defendants on December 6, 2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Michael Rodriguez. (Bonnaig, Denise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Remand . and to Defendant Newmark's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Document filed by Michael Rodriguez. (Bonnaig, Denise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Denise K. Bonnaig dated December 6, 2019. Document filed by Michael Rodriguez.(Bonnaig, Denise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Denise K. Bonnaig dated December 6, 2019. Document filed by Michael Rodriguez.(Bonnaig, Denise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 12/6/2019. (ama) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER: granting #36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The requested extension is Granted. DE # 36 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/27/2019) (ama) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Plaintiff's Replies addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Denise K. Bonnaig, Esq. dated November 26, 2019. Document filed by Michael Rodriguez.(Bonnaig, Denise) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Compel Arbitration. . Document filed by GFP Real Estate, LLC, Samuel Gonzalez, Musart Associates, LLC. (Smith, Ivan) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DECLARATION of Maureen M. Stampp in Support re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Compel Arbitration.. Document filed by GFP Real Estate, LLC, Samuel Gonzalez, Musart Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of New York County Supreme Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Internal Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Copy of Collective Bargaining Agreement)(Smith, Ivan) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Compel Arbitration. Document filed by GFP Real Estate, LLC, Samuel Gonzalez, Musart Associates, LLC.(Smith, Ivan) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Musart Associates, LLC.(Smith, Ivan) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by GFP Real Estate, LLC.(Smith, Ivan) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Smith, Ivan) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 158325/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17789825).Document filed by Musart Associates, LLC, GFP Real Estate, LLC, Samuel Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of New York County Supreme Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Consent of Defendants, #4 Exhibit D - Copy of Agreement)(Smith, Ivan) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.