This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/27/2022 at 06:25:31 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On January 20, 2022, Tammy Rodriguez (“Plaintiff”), on behalf of herself and as the representative of the Estate of Selena Rodriguez, represented by Jennie L. Anderson of Andrus Anderson LLP, filed a product liability lawsuit against Meta Platforms, Inc., formerly known as Facebook, Inc. (“Facebook” or “Meta”), doing business as Instagram (“Instagram”) and Snap, Inc., doing business as Snapchat (“Snapchat” and collectively, “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief and damages, along with costs and other reliefs, for the Defendants’ alleged negligence. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Northern District of California with Judge James Donato presiding.

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “This product liability action seeks to hold Defendants responsible for causing and contributing to burgeoning mental health crisis perpetrated upon the children and teenagers in the United States by Defendants and, specifically, for the wrongful death of 11-year-old Selena Rodriguez caused by Selena’s addictive use of and exposure to Defendants’ unreasonable dangerous and defective social media products. After struggling with the harmful effects of social media, Selena took her own life on July 21, 2021[...] Defendants have intentionally designed their products to maximize users’ ‘screen time, using complex algorithms designed to exploit human psychology and driven by the most advanced computer algorithms and artificial intelligence available to two of the largest technology companies in the world.” 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Defendants designed and have progressively modified their products to promote problematic and excessive use that they know is indicative of addictive and self-destructive use [...] Plaintiff alleges that Defendants failed to warn minor users and their parents of known dangers arising from anticipated use of their social media platforms. None of Plaintiff’s claims rely on treating Defendants as the publisher or speaker of any third party’s words. Plaintiff’s claims seek to hold Defendants accountable for their own allegedly wrongful acts and omissions”

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Decedent Selena Rodriguez was an 11-year-old girl who struggled for more than two years with an extreme addiction to Instagram and Snapchat [...] Plaintiff Tammy Rodriguez attempted to get Selena mental health treatment on multiple occasions. An outpatient therapist who evaluated Selena remarked that she had never seen a patient as addicted to social media as Selena. In the months leading up to Selena’s suicide, she was experiencing severe sleep deprivation that was caused and aggravated by her addiction to Instagram and Snapchat, and the constant 24-hour stream of notifications and alerts Defendants sent to Selena Rodriguez [...] As a proximate result of her addiction to Instagram and Snapchat, Selena Rodriguez committed suicide on July 21, 2021. She was eleven years old at the time.”

There are four claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first claim alleged is for strict product liability - design defect. The second claim alleged is for strict product liability - failure to warn. The third claim alleged is for negligence. The fourth claim alleged is for violations of California’s Unfair Competition Law Cal. Bus. & Prof Code §§ 17200, et seq.

In her prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for injunctive relief and damages, including punitive damages, for pecuniary loss and loss of Selena Rodriguez’s services, for the physical and mental pain and suffering of Selena Rodriguez, for medical care expenses along with reasonable costs and attorney fees, and any other relief the Court deems just.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00401

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tammy Rodriguez

Defendants

Snap, Inc.

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Facebook, Inc.

TikTok, Inc.

ByteDance, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laura R. Garrett

Attorney at Social Media Victims Law Center

1390 Market Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94102

Matthew P Bergman

Attorney at Social Media Victims Law Center PLLC

821 2Nd Avenue, Suite 2100

Seattle, WA 98104

Christopher L Ayers

Attorney at Seeger Weiss LLP

55 Challenger Road, 6Th Fl.

Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660

Jennie Lee Anderson

Attorney at Andrus Anderson LLP

155 Montgomery Street, Suite 900

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Hugh Blavin

Attorney at Attorney at Law

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Ariel Tal Teshuva

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Laura Maria Lopez

Attorney at Munger Tolles Olson

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Lauren Bell

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave Nw, Suite 500 East

Washington, DC 20001

Rose Leda Ehler

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, Ste 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ashley Margaret Simonsen

Attorney at Covington and Burling LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jacob T Spencer

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave. Nw, Washington

Washington, DC 20036

Kristin A. Linsley

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Laura Kathryn O'Boyle

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Rosemarie Theresa Ring

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Isaac Daniel Chaput

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

415 Mission Street, Suite 5400

San Francisco, CA 94105

Maria Georges

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

One City Center, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Phyllis Alene Jones

Attorney at Covington Burling LLP

One City Center, 850 Tenth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Albert Quoc Giang

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

633 West Fifth Street, Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

David Paul Mattern

Attorney at King & Spalding

1700 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Geoffrey Drake

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree St.

Atlanta, GA 30309

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

102 #2

MDL 3047 Docket Number 24 and attachments

102 #1

MDL 3047 Docket Number 22 and attachments

102 #102

Main Document

#101

(#101) NOTICE of Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of Illinois or the Western District of Missouri Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings. These documents are submitted to this court pursuant to JPML Rule 6.2 for informational purposes. The JPML will review the Motion for Transfer to determine whether to consolidate or coordinate the case. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

99 #1

Declaration Declaration of Rosemarie T. Ring

99 #99

Main Document

#97

(#97) *** DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR, REFILED AT DOCKET ENTRY #98 *** Supplemental Brief re #94 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #67 Second Amended Complaint filed by Snap, Inc.. (Related document(s) #94 ) (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/25/2022) Modified on 7/26/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/25/2022)

94 #1

Proposed Order

#67

(#94) Joint MOTION to Dismiss #67 Second Amended Complaint filed by ByteDance, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Snap, Inc., TikTok, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 8/12/2022. Replies due by 9/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 7/25/2022) Modified on 7/26/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#9

(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/27/2022. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

8 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

8 #8

Main Document

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tammy Rodriguez.. (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 1/26/2022) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Snap, Inc.. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 1/20/2022) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

153 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) Received Documents from MDL 3047 IN RE: Social Media Adolescent Addiction/Personal Injury Products Liability Litigation re MDL 3047 #s21, 22, 24 and attachments. (Attachments: #1 MDL 3047 Docket Number 22 and attachments, #2 MDL 3047 Docket Number 24 and attachments)(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2022) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) NOTICE of Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of Illinois or the Western District of Missouri Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings. These documents are submitted to this court pursuant to JPML Rule 6.2 for informational purposes. The JPML will review the Motion for Transfer to determine whether to consolidate or coordinate the case. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Docket(#100) ORDER. In light of the JPML proceedings, MDL No. 3047, the case is stayed pending further order. The case management conference set for August 11, 2022, and the hearing on the motion to dismiss set for October 13, 2022, are vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/2/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2022) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) Joint Motion and Proposed Order for Administrative Relief to Continue Initial Case Management Conference until October 13, 2022 filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., TikTok, Inc., Snap, Inc. ByteDance, Inc. and Tammy Rodriguez. Responses due by 8/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rosemarie T. Ring)(Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 7/28/2022) Modified on 7/29/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. *** NOTICE TO COUNSEL *** Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #97 Supplemental Brief filed by Snap, Inc .. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) Supplemental Brief (re #94 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #67 Second Amended Complaint) filed by Snap, Inc.. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/25/2022) Modified on 7/26/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) *** DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR, REFILED AT DOCKET ENTRY #98 *** Supplemental Brief re #94 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #67 Second Amended Complaint filed by Snap, Inc.. (Related document(s) #94 ) (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/25/2022) Modified on 7/26/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) Supplemental Brief re #94 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #67 Second Amended Complaint filed by ByteDance, Inc., TikTok, Inc.. (Related document(s) #94 ) (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 7/25/2022) Modified on 7/26/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) Declaration of Rosemarie T. Ring in Support of #94 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #67 Second Amended Complaint filed byByteDance, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Snap, Inc., TikTok, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #94 ) (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 7/25/2022) Modified on 7/26/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) Joint MOTION to Dismiss #67 Second Amended Complaint filed by ByteDance, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Snap, Inc., TikTok, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 8/12/2022. Replies due by 9/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 7/25/2022) Modified on 7/26/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint served on Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. c/o Jenn Bautista on 1/26/2022, filed by Tammy Rodriguez. (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 1/27/2022) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/27/2022. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2022) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tammy Rodriguez.. (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 1/26/2022) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Snap, Inc.. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/4/2022. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 1/20/2022) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Snap, Inc. with jury demand (Filing Fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-16824504) . Filed by Tammy Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 1/20/2022) Modified on 1/21/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/21/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TikTok, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ByteDance, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SNAP INC. is a litigant