This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2020 at 12:49:32 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Loews Hotels Holding Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Rodriguez filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Loews Hotels Holding Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Loretta A. Preska. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05053

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Loretta A. Preska

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Justin Rodriguez

Defendants

Loews Regency NY Holding LLC

Loews Regency NY Hotel LLC

Loews Hotels Holding Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Howley

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

620 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Gina Renee Merrill

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP (NYC)

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018-1405

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Verified Complaint (State Court)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice to Clerk of Filing of Removal (State Court)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Notice to Adverse Party of Notice of Removal

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 9/25/2020..(rpr) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/27/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Loews Regency NY Holding LLC, Loews Regency NY Hotel LLC..(Merrill, Gina) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties that the time within which Defendants Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Loews Regency NY Holding LLC, and Loews Regency NY Hotel LLC ( collectively "Defendants"), may move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including August 10, 2020. Defendants waive and do not object to personal service as establishing personal jurisdiction. No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of: and Defendants expressly reserve, any and all other defenses. The deadline for Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint was originally July 8, 2020. Plaintiff consents to this stipulation extending the deadline for Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to August 10, 2020. There has been no previous request for extension of time in connection with this matter. SO ORDERED. Loews Hotels Holding Corporation answer due 8/10/2020; Loews Regency NY Holding LLC answer due 8/10/2020; Loews Regency NY Hotel LLC answer due 8/10/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/7/2020) (va) Modified on 7/7/2020 (va). (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Loews Regency NY Holding LLC, Loews Regency NY Hotel LLC..(Merrill, Gina) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Randy Edward Kleinman on behalf of Justin Rodriguez..(Kleinman, Randy) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Loews Corporation for Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Loews Regency NY Holding LLC, Loews Regency NY Hotel LLC. Document filed by Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Loews Regency NY Holding LLC, Loews Regency NY Hotel LLC..(Merrill, Gina) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gina Renee Merrill on behalf of Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Loews Regency NY Holding LLC, Loews Regency NY Hotel LLC..(Merrill, Gina) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Howley, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 24464/2020E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20509754).Document filed by Loews Regency NY Hotel LLC, Loews Regency NY Holding LLC, Loews Hotels Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Verified Complaint (State Court), #2 Exhibit B - Notice to Clerk of Filing of Removal (State Court), #3 Exhibit C - Notice to Adverse Party of Notice of Removal).(Howley, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Loew's Hotels, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gina R. Merrill