This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 07:37:32 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Liberty Mutual Insurance

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Rodriguez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-05196

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Rodriguez

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRANDON A. SWARTZ

Attorney at SWARTZ CULLETON PC

547 E. Washington Ave.

Newtown, PA 18940

MARIA K. MCGINTY-FERRIS

Attorney at SWARTZ CULLETON PC

547 E Washington Ave

Newtown, PA 18940

Defendant Attorneys

BRIGID QUINN ALFORD

Attorney at MARSHALL, DENNEHEY, WARNER. COLEMAN & GOGGIN

100 Corporate Center Drivesuite 201

Camp Hill, PA 17011

POOJA R. MEHTA

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN&GOGGIN, P.C.

2000 Market St, Suite 2300Ste 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MARIA K. MCGINTY-FERRIS on behalf of Lisa Rodriguez (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#3

(#3) INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 12/7/21. 12/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIGID QUINN ALFORD on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance with Certificate of Service(ALFORD, BRIGID) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by POOJA R. MEHTA on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance with Certificate of Service(MEHTA, POOJA) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by POOJA R. MEHTA on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance with Certificate of Service(MEHTA, POOJA) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIGID QUINN ALFORD on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance with Certificate of Service(ALFORD, BRIGID) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 12/7/21. 12/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance. Forwarded To: 11/24/21 on Counsel (dt, ) Modified on 11/29/2021 (dt, ). (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MARIA K. MCGINTY-FERRIS on behalf of Lisa Rodriguez (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Rodriguez, Lisa UIM against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15570374.), filed by Lisa Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(SWARTZ, BRANDON) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant