This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/09/2021 at 08:26:43 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Kellermeyer Bergensons Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 Rodriguez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Kellermeyer Bergensons Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Gettleman and Heather K. McShain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06679

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

Referral Judge

Heather K. McShain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alba Amelia Rodriguez

Defendants

Kellermeyer Bergensons Services, LLC

IKEA U.S., INC.

Ikea

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel I Schlade

134 N. Lasalle, Suite 1208

Chicago, IL 60602

James M. Dore

Attorney at Attorney at Law

134 N. Lasalle St., Suite 1208

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Deborah Share

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.c.

155 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60606

Jennifer L Colvin

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

155 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

Joint Status Report

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge McShain for discovery supervision and settlement #15 . On review of the parties' joint initial status report #13 and Judge Gettleman's order setting a fact discovery completion date of 06/30/2021 #14 , the parties shall meet and confer and file, on or before 01/15/2021, a proposed discovery schedule that includes: (a) a deadline for Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures; (b) a deadline for the issuance of written discovery requests; (c) a statement indicating whether discovery of electronically stored information is anticipated; and (d) a description of settlement discussions, if any. The schedule should also advise the Court of any other issues the parties believe should be brought to the Court's attention. The parties are directed to contact the Court at any time (by email to Chambers_McShain@ilnd.uscourts.gov) should they be interested in discussing settlement. Mailed notice. (pk, ) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Heather K. McShain for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision and settlement. (cn) Mailed notice. (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Discovery ordered closed on 6/30/2021. End of discovery telephonic status hearing set for 6/30/2021 at 9:15 a.m. The call-in number is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 1503395. The court refers discovery supervision and settlement matters to Magistrate Judge McShain. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by IKEA U.S., INC. (Share, Deborah) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report on this court's form on or before 12/30/2020. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report) (cn). (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by IKEA U.S., INC.(Share, Deborah) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #9 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due on or before 12/16/2020. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Defendant IKEA U.S., INC. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Unopposed Motion fo Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead) (Share, Deborah) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant IKEA U.S., INC. by Deborah Share (Share, Deborah) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant IKEA U.S., INC. by Jennifer L Colvin (Colvin, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alba Amelia Rodriguez as to Kellermeyer Bergensons Services, LLC on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Dore, James) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alba Amelia Rodriguez as to Ikea U.S., Inc. a/k/a Ikea on 11/11/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. (Dore, James) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alba Amelia Rodriguez by James M. Dore (Dore, James) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Ikea U.S., Inc. a/k/a Ikea, Kellermeyer Bergensons Services, LLC (cp, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alba Amelia Rodriguez by Daniel I Schlade (Schlade, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schlade, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Alba Amelia Rodriguez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17632633.(Schlade, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less