This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/30/2022 at 08:47:00 (UTC).

Rodriguez et al v. Hy-Vee, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 Rodriguez filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Hy-Vee, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Helen C. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00072

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger

Referral Judge

Helen C. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Theresa L Rodriguez

Theresa L. Rodriguez

Zachary M. Shank

Michael P. Mansberger

Heidi L. Detra

Tim Campbell

Defendants

Hy-Vee, Inc.

The Board of Directors of Hy-Vee, Inc.

Hy-Vee and Affiliates 401(k) Plan Investment Committee

Board of Directors of Hy-Vee, Inc.

John Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeannette M Keller

Po Box 126

West Liberty, IA 52776

Jeannette M. Keller

Attorney at BOWMAN, DEPREE & MURPHY

4711 North Brady Street, Suite 22 S

Davenport, IA 52806

Donald R. Reavey

Attorney at CAPOZZI ADLER, P.C.

2933 North Front Street

Harrisburg, PA 17110

Gabrielle Kelerchian

Attorney at CAPOZZI ADLER, P.C.

312 Old Lancaster Road

Merion Station, PA 19066

Mark K. Gyandoh

Attorney at CAPOZZI ADLER, P.C.

312 Old Lancaster Road

Merion Station, PA 19066

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4747765., filed by Theresa L Rodriguez. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/31/2022. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keller, Jeannette) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Zachary M. Shank, Tim Campbell, Heidi L. Detra, Theresa L. Rodriguez, Michael P. Mansberger; Hy-Vee, Inc. waiver served on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Zachary M. Shank, Tim Campbell, Heidi L. Detra, Theresa L. Rodriguez, Michael P. Mansberger; The Board of Directors of Hy-Vee, Inc. waiver served on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Zachary M. Shank, Tim Campbell, Heidi L. Detra, Theresa L. Rodriguez, Michael P. Mansberger; Hy-Vee and Affiliates 401(k) Plan Investment Committee waiver served on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Cert of Good Standing - DRR

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Cert of Good Standing - GPK

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Donald R. Reavey; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gabrielle P. Kelerchian. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/10/2022. (kjw) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-4757957 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Tim Campbell, Heidi L. Detra, Michael P. Mansberger, Theresa L. Rodriguez, Zachary M. Shank. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Good Standing - GPK)(Kelerchian, Gabrielle) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-4757944 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Tim Campbell, Heidi L. Detra, Michael P. Mansberger, Theresa L. Rodriguez, Zachary M. Shank. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Good Standing - DRR)(Reavey, Donald) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Zachary M. Shank, Tim Campbell, Heidi L. Detra, Theresa L. Rodriguez, Michael P. Mansberger; Hy-Vee and Affiliates 401(k) Plan Investment Committee waiver served on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Zachary M. Shank, Tim Campbell, Heidi L. Detra, Theresa L. Rodriguez, Michael P. Mansberger; The Board of Directors of Hy-Vee, Inc. waiver served on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Zachary M. Shank, Tim Campbell, Heidi L. Detra, Theresa L. Rodriguez, Michael P. Mansberger; Hy-Vee, Inc. waiver served on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark K. Gyandoh. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/7/2022. (kjw) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-4753888 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Tim Campbell, Heidi L. Detra, Michael P. Mansberger, Theresa L. Rodriguez, Zachary M. Shank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4747765., filed by Theresa L Rodriguez. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/31/2022. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keller, Jeannette) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hy-Vee, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABRIELLE KELERCHIAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald R. Reavey