This case was last updated from PACER on 05/22/2021 at 08:00:30 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Hillstone EJ RA Holdings, LLC.

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 Rodriguez filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Hillstone EJ RA Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher A. Boyko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00645

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher A. Boyko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yvonne Rodriguez

Defendant

Hillstone EJ RA Holdings, LLC. doing business as Rocky River Healthcare of Westpark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James J.B. Hux

Attorney at Ste. 18147

3 Severance Circle

Cleveland Heights, OH 44118

Defendant Attorneys

Scott E. Salsbury

Attorney at Salsbury & Salsbury

5611 Hudson Drive

Hudson, OH 44236

Kristina Leach

Attorney at Salsbury & Salsbury

5611 Hudson Drive

Hudson, OH 44236

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Hillstone EJ RA Holdings, LLC. (Leach, Kristina) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#3

(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Hillstone EJ RA Holdings, LLC. on 4/19/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Yvonne Rodriguez Related document #2 (T,A) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Case Management Conference with telephonic case management conference to be held on 6/25/21 at 2:00 PM before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. This Court requires the participation of lead counsel. The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of separate email of the telephone number for the conference call. Parties shall be available by phone, if needed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/18/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Report of Parties Planning Meeting, #2 Exhibit B - Consent Package)(S,HR) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Hillstone EJ RA Holdings, LLC. (Leach, Kristina) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Hillstone EJ RA Holdings, LLC. on 4/19/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Yvonne Rodriguez Related document #2 (T,A) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Hillstone EJ RA Holdings, LLC. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 9414 7118 9956 0198 1556 69. (M,MT) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Hillstone EJ RA Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketJudge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint for damages and injunctive relief with jury demand against Hillstone EJ RA Holdings, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10734997. Filed by Yvonne Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Notice of Right to Sue) (Hux, James) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James J.B. Hux