This case was last updated from PACER on 08/15/2020 at 11:59:17 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Allen Distribution, LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 Rodriguez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Allen Distribution, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and Carolyn K. Delaney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01202

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Carolyn K. Delaney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jobany Rodriguez

Defendant

Allen Distribution, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Joshua Wasserman

Attorney at Mayall Hurley, PC

2453 Grand Canal Blvd.

Stockton, CA 95207

Jenny Dione Baysinger

Attorney at Mayall Hurley, PC

2453 Grand Canal Blvd.

Stockton, CA 95207

Defendant Attorneys

Micah T. Saul, PHV

Attorney at McNees Wallace & Nurick, LLC

570 Lausch Ln, Suite 200

Lancaster, PA 17601

Matthew Golper

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

2600 Michelson Dr., Suite 900

Irvine, CA 92612

Andrew L. Levy, PHV

Attorney at McNees Wallace & Nurick, LLC

100 Pine St, Po Box 1166

Harrisburg, PA 17108-1166

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/12/2020 EXTENDING Defendant Allen Distribution, LP's time to respond to #1 Complaint to 8/31/2020. (Huang, H) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Further Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Allen Distribution, LP. (Golper, Matthew) Modified on 8/11/2020 (Huang, H). (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#9

(#9) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/29/2020. Added attorney Micah T. Saul, PHV for Allen Distribution, LP. (Huang, H) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

8 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#8

(#8) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Allen Distribution, LP for attorney Micah T. Saul, Esq to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-9021951) (Attachments: #1 ertificate of Good Standing)(Golper, Matthew) Modified on 7/28/2020 (York, M). (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#7

(#7) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/20/2020. Added attorney Andrew L. Levy, PHV for Allen Distribution, LP. (Coll, A) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

6 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#6

(#6) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Allen Distribution, LP for attorney Andrew L. Levy to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-8995601) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Golper, Matthew) Modified on 7/15/2020 (York, M). (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Allen Distribution, LP. (Golper, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME to 8/11/2020, to Respond to #1 Complaint by Allen Distribution, LP. Attorney Golper, Matthew added. (Golper, Matthew) Modified on 7/14/2020 (York, M). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

3 #3

VDRP

3 #2

Consent Form

3 #1

Standing Order

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jobany Rodriguez. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8942855) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wasserman, Robert) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/12/2020 EXTENDING Defendant Allen Distribution, LP's time to respond to #1 Complaint to 8/31/2020. (Huang, H) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Further Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Allen Distribution, LP. (Golper, Matthew) Modified on 8/11/2020 (Huang, H). (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/29/2020. Added attorney Micah T. Saul, PHV for Allen Distribution, LP. (Huang, H) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Allen Distribution, LP for attorney Micah T. Saul, Esq to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-9021951) (Attachments: #1 ertificate of Good Standing)(Golper, Matthew) Modified on 7/28/2020 (York, M). (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/20/2020. Added attorney Andrew L. Levy, PHV for Allen Distribution, LP. (Coll, A) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Allen Distribution, LP for attorney Andrew L. Levy to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-8995601) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Golper, Matthew) Modified on 7/15/2020 (York, M). (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Allen Distribution, LP. (Golper, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME to 8/11/2020, to Respond to #1 Complaint by Allen Distribution, LP. Attorney Golper, Matthew added. (Golper, Matthew) Modified on 7/14/2020 (York, M). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Allen Distribution, LP* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert Joshua Wasserman* *Mayall Hurley, PC* *2453 Grand Canal Blvd.* *Stockton, CA 95207*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jobany Rodriguez. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8942855) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wasserman, Robert) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less