This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:02:42 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. 40-66 Ithaca St. Owners Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Rodriguez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against 40-66 Ithaca St Owners Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven M. Gold and Margo K. Brodie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01006

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven M. Gold

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Segundo Emilio Rodriguez

Defendants

Joel Wiener

40-66 Ithaca St. Owners Corp.

Pinnacle Group NY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas J. Lamadrid

Attorney at Eisner & Dictor, P.C.

39 Broadway, Suite 1540

New York, NY 10006

Benjamin Nathan Dictor

Attorney at Eisner & Dictor, P.C.

39 Broadway, Suite 1540

New York, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Nathan Dictor on behalf of Segundo Emilio Rodriguez (aty to be noticed) (Dictor, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#13

(#13) Letter dated April 11, 2019 from Thomas J. Lamadrid to Clerk of Court, enclosing the Affidavit of Service of the Summons, Complaint, etc., upon the corporate defendants 40-66 Ithaca St. Owners Corp. and Pinnacle Group NY LLC, together with a copy of the respective ECF Notices of Electronic Filing. (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez. 40-66 Ithaca St. Owners Corp. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez. Pinnacle Group NY LLC served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#9

(#9) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#8

(#8) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#6

(#6) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 40-66 Ithaca St. Owners Corp., Pinnacle Group NY LLC, Joel Wiener filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11215523 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez. (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Nathan Dictor on behalf of Segundo Emilio Rodriguez (aty to be noticed) (Dictor, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Letter dated April 11, 2019 from Thomas J. Lamadrid to Clerk of Court, enclosing the Affidavit of Service of the Summons, Complaint, etc., upon the corporate defendants 40-66 Ithaca St. Owners Corp. and Pinnacle Group NY LLC, together with a copy of the respective ECF Notices of Electronic Filing. (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez. 40-66 Ithaca St. Owners Corp. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez. Pinnacle Group NY LLC served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • NOTICE - The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons. by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons. by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 40-66 Ithaca St. Owners Corp., Pinnacle Group NY LLC, Joel Wiener filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11215523 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Segundo Emilio Rodriguez. (Lamadrid, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.