This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2021 at 09:18:52 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ PEREZ v. GARLAND et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 RODRIGUEZ PEREZ filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against GARLAND. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Doris L. Pryor and James R. Sweeney II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00146

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JUAN RODRIGUEZ PEREZ

Defendants and Respondents

ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS

PAUL HARDEN

MERRICK B GARLAND

HENRY LUCERO

MERRICK B. GARLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

Jason A. Flora

Attorney at FLORA LEGAL GROUP

5449 West Washington Street

Indianapolis, IN 46241

Respondent Attorney

Shelese M. Woods

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (Indianapolis)

10 West Market Street, Suite 2100

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) JUDGMENT - The Petition for Habeas Corpus and Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief are denied for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction and this action is dismissed for lack of subject-jurisdiction. This is a final judgment. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 3/18/2021.(KAA) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER - The Petition for Habeas Corpus ECF No. #1 and Petitioner's Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order ECF No. #4 are denied and this action is dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 3/18/2021.(KAA) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER VACATING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - The Court now VACATES the Telephonic Status Conference scheduled for March 18, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. (Eastern). An Order will be forthcoming. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/18/2021.(KAA) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#13

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: This matter is set for a telephone status conference on March 18, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. (Eastern). The purpose of the conference is to discuss the Motion for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order, Dkt. #4 . Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/18/2021.(CAG) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) JUDGMENT - The Petition for Habeas Corpus and Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief are denied for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction and this action is dismissed for lack of subject-jurisdiction. This is a final judgment. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 3/18/2021.(KAA) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER - The Petition for Habeas Corpus ECF No. #1 and Petitioner's Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order ECF No. #4 are denied and this action is dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 3/18/2021.(KAA) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER VACATING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - The Court now VACATES the Telephonic Status Conference scheduled for March 18, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. (Eastern). An Order will be forthcoming. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/18/2021.(KAA) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUAN RODRIGUEZ PEREZ. MERRICK B GARLAND served on 3/18/2021; HENRY LUCERO served on 3/18/2021; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 3/18/2021. (Flora, Jason) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: This matter is set for a telephone status conference on March 18, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. (Eastern). The purpose of the conference is to discuss the Motion for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order, Dkt. #4 . Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/18/2021.(CAG) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Shelese M. Woods on behalf of Respondents MERRICK B GARLAND, HENRY LUCERO, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. (KAA) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Order Granting Emergency Temporary Restraining Order, re #4 Motion for TRO, filed by Petitioner JUAN RODRIGUEZ PEREZ. (Flora, Jason) Modified on 3/18/2021 (BRR). (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to MERRICK B GARLAND, PAUL HARDEN, HENRY LUCERO, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. (KAA) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (KAA) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of Petitioner's Motion for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff JUAN RODRIGUEZ PEREZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Petitioner's Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Removal Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - I-130 Approval Notice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - I-212 Approval Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - I-601A Approval Notice, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Interview Qualification)(Flora, Jason) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff JUAN RODRIGUEZ PEREZ. (Flora, Jason) Modified on 3/18/2021 (BRR). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MERRICK B GARLAND, PAUL HARDEN, HENRY LUCERO, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. (Flora, Jason) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Flora on behalf of Plaintiff JUAN RODRIGUEZ PEREZ. (Flora, Jason) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by JUAN RODRIGUEZ PEREZ. (Filing fee $5, receipt number 0756-6463004) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Flora, Jason) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shelese M. Woods