This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2022 at 09:02:09 (UTC).

Rodriguez-Perez et al v. Dr. Miguel E. Abreu-Garcia et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 Rodriguez-Perez filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Dr Miguel E Abreu-Garcia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01622

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raul M. Arias-Marxuach

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ricardo Rodriguez-Perez

Victor Rodriguez

Defendants

Dr. Miguel E. Abreu-Garcia

Jane Doe

Abreu-Doe Conjugal Partnership

Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo de Puerto Rico, Inc.

Insurance Company X

Insurance Company Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jorge M. Suro-Ballester

Attorney at Suro & Suro Law Office

1225 Ponce De Leon Ave.Ph-2

San Juan, PR 00907-3921

Miguel A. Suro-Carrasco

Attorney at Suro & Suro Law Office

1225 Ponce De Leon Ave.Ph-2

San Juan, PR 00907-3921

Defendant Attorneys

Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez

416 Ave. Escorialcaparra Heights

San Juan, PR 00920

Gilberto C. Ramos-Martinez

Attorney at JPL Law Firm LLC

P.O. Box 1904

Guaynabo, PR 00970

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MOTION for extension of time until 3/16/2022 to File Answer filed by Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez on behalf of Dr. Miguel E. Abreu-Garcia Responses due by 3/3/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dieppa-Gonzalez, Ramonita) Modified docket event type and edit text title on 2/17/2022 (rim). (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez on behalf of Dr. Miguel E. Abreu-Garcia (Dieppa-Gonzalez, Ramonita) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo de Puerto Rico, Inc. served on 1/5/2022, answer due 1/26/2022. (Suro-Ballester, Jorge) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Abreu-Doe Conjugal Partnership served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Suro-Ballester, Jorge) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Dr. Miguel E. Abreu-Garcia served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Suro-Ballester, Jorge) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Gilberto C. Ramos-Martinez on behalf of Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 2/9/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Martinez, Gilberto) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

4 #1

Summons

4 #4

Main Document

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Miguel A. Suro-Carrasco on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Suro-Carrasco, Miguel) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Appearance of Counsel

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall plead or otherwise defend by March 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 2/17/2022. (mrr) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for extension of time until 3/16/2022 to File Answer filed by Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez on behalf of Dr. Miguel E. Abreu-Garcia Responses due by 3/3/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dieppa-Gonzalez, Ramonita) Modified docket event type and edit text title on 2/17/2022 (rim). (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez on behalf of Dr. Miguel E. Abreu-Garcia (Dieppa-Gonzalez, Ramonita) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo de Puerto Rico, Inc. served on 1/5/2022, answer due 1/26/2022. (Suro-Ballester, Jorge) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Abreu-Doe Conjugal Partnership served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Suro-Ballester, Jorge) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Dr. Miguel E. Abreu-Garcia served on 1/21/2022, answer due 2/11/2022. (Suro-Ballester, Jorge) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo de P.R., Inc. shall plead or otherwise defend by February 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 1/28/2022. (mrr) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Gilberto C. Ramos-Martinez on behalf of Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 2/9/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Martinez, Gilberto) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Abreu-Doe Conjugal Partnership, Dr. Miguel E. Abreu-Garcia, Hospital Espanol Auxilio Mutuo de Puerto Rico, Inc., Jane Doe (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (arg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Miguel A. Suro-Carrasco on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Suro-Carrasco, Miguel) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7577380.), filed by Victor Rodriguez, Ricardo Rodriguez-Perez. Service due by 3/21/2022, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Appearance of Counsel, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Suro-Ballester, Jorge) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hospital Espaol Auxilio Mutuo de Puerto Rico, Inc. d/b/a Hospital Auxilio Mutuo is a litigant

Latest cases where Insurance Company B is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez