This case was last updated from PACER on 07/31/2021 at 08:45:54 (UTC).

Rodriguez-Ortiz v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Rodriguez-Ortiz filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Dowdell and Susan E Huntsman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00233

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E Dowdell

Referral Judge

Susan E Huntsman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Rodriguez-Ortiz

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dustin Joseph Vanderhoof

Attorney at Smolen Law PLLC

611 S. Detroit Ave., 74120

Tulsa, OK 74012

Laura L Hamilton

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Donald Eugene Smolen, II

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Defendant Attorneys

Jason Andrew Brown

Attorney at Atkinson Haskins Nellis Brittingham Gladd & Fiasco

525 S Main Ste 1500

Tulsa, OK 74103-4524

Raymond Conrad Purdom, III

Attorney at Atkinson Haskins Nellis Brittingham Gladd & Fiasco

525 S Main Ste 1500

Tulsa, OK 74103-4524

John Scott Gladd

Attorney at Atkinson Haskins Nellis Brittingham Gladd & Fiasco

525 S Main Ste 1500

Tulsa, OK 74103-4524

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#18

(#18) ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 8/16/2021) (SAS, Chambers) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#17

(#17) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#16

(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Purdom, Raymond) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#15

(#15) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Raymond Conrad Purdom, III on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Raymond Conrad Purdom, III added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft).] (Purdom, Raymond) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#14

(#14) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Andrew Brown on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Jason Andrew Brown added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft).] (Brown, Jason) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#13

(#13) JURY DEMAND by Jose Rodriguez-Ortiz (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dustin Joseph Vanderhoof on behalf of Jose Rodriguez-Ortiz [Note: Attorney Dustin Joseph Vanderhoof added to party Jose Rodriguez-Ortiz(pty:pla).] (Vanderhoof, Dustin) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr on behalf of Jose Rodriguez-Ortiz [Note: Attorney Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr added to party Jose Rodriguez-Ortiz(pty:pla).] (Murphy, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE To Parties of Removal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#5

(#5) JURY DEMAND by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#3

(#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

2 #3

Exhibit 3-Docket Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit 2-Summons

2 #1

Exhibit 1-Petition

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2021-1088 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2419500) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (With attachments) (Gladd, John) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #19 ) (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 8/16/2021) (SAS, Chambers) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Purdom, Raymond) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Raymond Conrad Purdom, III on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Raymond Conrad Purdom, III added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft).] (Purdom, Raymond) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Andrew Brown on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Jason Andrew Brown added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft).] (Brown, Jason) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JURY DEMAND by Jose Rodriguez-Ortiz (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dustin Joseph Vanderhoof on behalf of Jose Rodriguez-Ortiz [Note: Attorney Dustin Joseph Vanderhoof added to party Jose Rodriguez-Ortiz(pty:pla).] (Vanderhoof, Dustin) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr on behalf of Jose Rodriguez-Ortiz [Note: Attorney Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr added to party Jose Rodriguez-Ortiz(pty:pla).] (Murphy, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald Eugene Smolen, II on behalf of Jose Rodriguez-Ortiz (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE To Parties of Removal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JURY DEMAND by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2021-1088 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2419500) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (With attachments) (Gladd, John) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by Jose Rodriguez-Ortiz (ll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dustin Vanderhoof

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura L Hamilton