This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:42:27 (UTC).

Rodriguez et al v. Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Rodriguez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04743

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Manuel Rodriguez

Elaine Rodriguez

Defendant

Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michelle Lorraine Calhoun

Attorney at Calhoun Law Firm

1350 North Loop 1604 E, Ste 104

San Antonio, TX 78154

Defendant Attorney

Daniel John Baldwin

Attorney at Jones Walker

811 Main Street, Ste. 2900

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A-1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 269th Judicial District Court of Harris County, case number 2019-80323 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23714173) filed by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Baldwin, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 269th Judicial District Court of Harris County, case number 2019-80323 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23714173) filed by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Baldwin, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.