This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/13/2020 at 10:49:07 (UTC).

Rodrigue v. National Interstate Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Rodrigue filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against National Interstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eldon E. Fallon and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02267

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eldon E. Fallon

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Curtis Rodrigue

Defendants

Slay Transportation Company, Incorporated

Norman Nelson

National Interstate Insurance Company

Slay Transportation Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gerald Adam Savoie

Attorney at Dudley DeBosier Injury Lawyers APLC

4300 Youree Drive, Suite 250, 71105

Shreveport, LA 71101

Christopher Bryan Gioe

Attorney at Dudley Debosier, PLC (New Orleans)

622 Baronne Street

New Orleans, LA 70113

Steven A. DeBosier

Attorney at Dudley DeBosier, PLC (Baton Rouge)

1075 Government St.

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

David M. Geerken

Attorney at Dudley Debosier, PLC (New Orleans)

622 Baronne Street

New Orleans, LA 70113

Defendant Attorneys

Jordan M. Jeansonne

Attorney at Perrier & Lacoste, LLC

365 Canal Street, Suite 2550

New Orleans, LA 70130

Guy D. Perrier

Attorney at Perrier & Lacoste, LLC

365 Canal Street, Suite 2550

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Status Conference set for 10/21/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Jury Trial set for 5/24/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 4/12/2021. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jeg) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#7

(#7) PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE: A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 15, 2020, at 10:30AM, for the purpose of scheduling a pre-trial conference and trial on the merits and for a discussion of the status and discovery cut-off dates. Please use the following information to call in for the conference: Dial: 888-557-8511 Access code: 6655019 By Clerk.(jeg) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#6

(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by National Interstate Insurance Company, Slay Transportation Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent American Financial Group, Inc. for National Interstate Insurance Company (Jeansonne, Jordan) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by National Interstate Insurance Company, Norman Nelson, Slay Transportation Company, Inc. (Jeansonne, Jordan) Modified on 8/24/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

2 #6

State Court Pleadings Exhibit 5

2 #5

State Court Pleadings Exhibit 4

2 #4

State Court Pleadings Exhibit 3

#2

(#2) Notice of Compliance by National Interstate Insurance Company, Norman Nelson, Slay Transportation Company, Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 List of Pleadings, #2 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 1, #3 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 2, #4 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 3, #5 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 4, #6 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 5)(Jeansonne, Jordan) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

1 #8

Exhibit E

1 #7

Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit A

1 #3

Certificate of Filing

1 #2

Verification

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd JDC Parish of St. Tammany, case number 202012008 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8449498) filed by Norman Nelson, Slay Transportation Company, Incorporated, National Interstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Certificate of Filing, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E)Attorney Jordan M. Jeansonne added to party National Interstate Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan M. Jeansonne added to party Norman Nelson(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan M. Jeansonne added to party Slay Transportation Company, Incorporated(pty:dft).(Jeansonne, Jordan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/18/2020) (bm). (Entered: 08/14/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Status Conference set for 10/21/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Jury Trial set for 5/24/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 4/12/2021. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jeg) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE: A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 15, 2020, at 10:30AM, for the purpose of scheduling a pre-trial conference and trial on the merits and for a discussion of the status and discovery cut-off dates. Please use the following information to call in for the conference: Dial: 888-557-8511 Access code: 6655019 By Clerk.(jeg) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by National Interstate Insurance Company, Slay Transportation Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent American Financial Group, Inc. for National Interstate Insurance Company (Jeansonne, Jordan) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by National Interstate Insurance Company, Norman Nelson, Slay Transportation Company, Inc. (Jeansonne, Jordan) Modified on 8/24/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (bm) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Compliance by National Interstate Insurance Company, Norman Nelson, Slay Transportation Company, Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 List of Pleadings, #2 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 1, #3 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 2, #4 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 3, #5 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 4, #6 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 5)(Jeansonne, Jordan) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd JDC Parish of St. Tammany, case number 202012008 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8449498) filed by Norman Nelson, Slay Transportation Company, Incorporated, National Interstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Certificate of Filing, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E)Attorney Jordan M. Jeansonne added to party National Interstate Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan M. Jeansonne added to party Norman Nelson(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan M. Jeansonne added to party Slay Transportation Company, Incorporated(pty:dft).(Jeansonne, Jordan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/18/2020) (bm). (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SLAY TRANSPORTATION CO INC (D/B/A SLAY TRANSPORTATION/SLAY is a litigant

Latest cases where National Interstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan M. Jeansonne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Guy D. Perrier