This case was last updated from PACER on 07/31/2020 at 15:34:37 (UTC).

Rodgers v. Refresco U.S., Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 Rodgers filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Refresco U S , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00169

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saudi L. Rodgers

Defendant

Refresco U.S., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles C. Vaught

Attorney at Armstrong & Vaught, PLC

2727 E 21St St, Ste 505

Tulsa, OK 74114

Jessica N. Vaught

Attorney at Armstrong & Vaught, PLC

2727 E 21St St, Ste 505

Tulsa, OK 74114

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER of Service of Summons returned executed. Refresco U.S., Inc. received waiver on 7/2/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Waiver filed by Saudi L. Rodgers (Vaught, Charles) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica N. Vaught on behalf of Saudi L. Rodgers (Vaught, Jessica) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Refresco U.S., Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 6/8/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Refresco U.S., Inc. by Saudi L. Rodgers (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Saudi L. Rodgers (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER of Service of Summons returned executed. Refresco U.S., Inc. received waiver on 7/2/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Waiver filed by Saudi L. Rodgers (Vaught, Charles) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica N. Vaught on behalf of Saudi L. Rodgers (Vaught, Jessica) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Refresco U.S., Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 6/1/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1369704 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Saudi L. Rodgers (Vaught, Charles) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 6/8/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Refresco U.S., Inc. by Saudi L. Rodgers (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Saudi L. Rodgers (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less