This case was last updated from PACER on 08/18/2019 at 07:18:53 (UTC).

RODGERS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 RODGERS filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-13968

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERBERT O RODGERS

Defendants

COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL

Philadelphia, PA 19123

UNITED STATES ATTORNEY DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADRIENNE FREYA JARVIS

800 North Kings Highway, Suite 304

Cherry Hill, NJ 08034

Defendant Attorney

JOANNE KELLEY KERNICKY

Attorney at Social Security Administration

300 Spring Garden Street, 6Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19123

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP)(JARVIS, ADRIENNE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (cry, ). (Entered: 06/19/2019)

1 #2

*Restricted*

#2

(#2) ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP application. ORDERED that the Clerk file the complaint etc Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/20/2019. (cry, ) Modified on 6/24/2019 (cry, ). (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Text of Proposed Order

1 #1

*Restricted*

#4

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Administrative Record Filed - Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10)(KERNICKY, JOANNE) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by JOANNE KELLEY KERNICKY on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (KERNICKY, JOANNE) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HERBERT O RODGERS. ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HERBERT O RODGERS. OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL served on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HERBERT O RODGERS. UNITED STATES ATTORNEY DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY served on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the USM Transmittal letter attached to docket entry #3 filed by the Clerk's office on 6/21/20189 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (cry, ) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from ADRIENNE F. JARVIS. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (cry, ) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT #1 against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by HERBERT O RODGERS.(cry, ) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP application. ORDERED that the Clerk file the complaint etc Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/20/2019. (cry, ) Modified on 6/24/2019 (cry, ). (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Judge Noel L. Hillman added. (dd, ) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP)(JARVIS, ADRIENNE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (cry, ). (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.