This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/04/2021 at 06:29:17 (UTC).

Rodas-Mazariegos et al v. Moniz et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2020 Rodas-Mazariegos filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Moniz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathaniel M. Gorton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10597

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathaniel M. Gorton

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Ray Anthony Marzouca

Mario Luis Rodas-Mazariegos

Respondent

Antone Moniz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Susan B. Church

Attorney at Demissie & Church

929 Massachusetts Avenue, Suite 01

Cambridge, MA 02139

Matthew Segal

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union

211 Congress Street

Boston, MA 02110

Daniel L. McFadden

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union

211 Congress Street

Boston, MA 02110

Adriana Lafaille

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union

211 Congress Street

Boston, MA 02110

Respondent Attorney

Rayford A. Farquhar

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Suite 9200

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#7

#8

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#12

#13

RESTRICTED

#14

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

#16

RESTRICTED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Antone Moniz (Farquhar, Rayford) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ray Anthony Marzouca, Mario Luis Rodas-Mazariegos (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Susan B. Church on behalf of Mario Luis Rodas-Mazariegos (Church, Susan) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Susan B. Church on behalf of Ray Anthony Marzouca (Church, Susan) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. 1. Antone Moniz, Superintendent of the Plymouth County Correctional Facility, shall be the sole respondent. See Rumsfeld v. Padilla, 542 U.S. 426, 439 (2004) (immediate custodian of petitioner is proper respondent in habeas action); Vasquez v. Reno, 233 F.3d 688, 696 (1st Cir. 2000) (same, as applied to immigration detainee). The other respondents shall be dismissed without prejudice. 2. The clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the petition upon Superintendent Moniz and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. 3. The respondent shall file an answer or other responsive pleading within 3 days of the date of this order; 4. In order to give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts without providing the Court 48 hours' advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. Any such 48-hour notice period shall commence at the date and time such notice is filed and expire 48 hours later, except "[i]f the period would end on a Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday, the period continues to run until the same time on the next day that is not a Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday." Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a)(2)(C). (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Ray Anthony Marzouca, Mario Luis Rodas-Mazariegos re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana Lafaille on behalf of Ray Anthony Marzouca, Mario Luis Rodas-Mazariegos (Lafaille, Adriana) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of Ray Anthony Marzouca, Mario Luis Rodas-Mazariegos (Segal, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Ray Anthony Marzouca, Mario Luis Rodas-Mazariegos (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), of Jonathan Golob, MD by Ray Anthony Marzouca, Mario Luis Rodas-Mazariegos. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), of Robert B. Greifinger, MD by Ray Anthony Marzouca, Mario Luis Rodas-Mazariegos. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), of Kerry E. Doyle, Esq. by Ray Anthony Marzouca, Mario Luis Rodas-Mazariegos. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), of Matthew S. Cameron, Esq. by Ray Anthony Marzouca, Mario Luis Rodas-Mazariegos. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8170749 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Ray Anthony Marzouca, Mario Luis Rodas-Mazariegos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet)(McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less