This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 10:26:30 (UTC).

Rock Creek Networks,LLC v. Nvidia Corporation

Case Summary

On June 25, 2021, Rock Creek Networks, LLC (“Plaintiff” or “RCN”), represented by Cabrach J. Connor of Connor Kudlac Lee PLLC filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Nvidia Corporation (“Nvidia” or “Defendant”), seeking declaratory relief, compensatory damages and costs for alleged infringement of patented technology relating to Lan Interface owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas. 

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Plaintiff is the owner, by assignment, of U.S. Patent No. 6,671,750 (the “’750 Patent”), entitled LAN INTERFACE, which issued on December 30, 2003. A copy of the ’750 Patent is attached hereto as Exhibit PX-750. Upon information and belief, Defendant has infringed and continues to infringe one or more claims, including Claim 1, of the ’750 Patent by making, using, importing, selling, and/or, offering for sale the Accused Products in the United States without authority.” 

 

It was further alleged by the Plaintiff that, “Defendant has infringed and continues to infringe the ’750 Patent either directly or through the acts of inducement in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271. The Accused Products have a LAN interface that has a separator connected between said LAN controller and said I/O bus, for electrically disconnecting said LAN controller from said I/O bus.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Each of the Director and Officer Defendants, as among other things, signers of the Registration Statement, exercised control directly and indirectly over Athira in connection with the violations of the 1933 Act claims asserted herein, including the preparation and dissemination of the Registration Statement and prospectus.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “In operation, the link pulse detector, when detecting a link pulse output from the counter device, controls the LAN controller and the isolation section to controllably bring them to an operation state thereof and, when not detecting a link pulse output from the counter device, controls the LAN controller and the isolation section to controllably bring them to a non-operation state.Defendant’s infringing activities are and have been without authority or license under the ’750 Patent.” 

 

There is one claim for relief by the Plaintiff dealing with the alleged infringement of one or more claims of the U.S. Patent No. 6,671,750. 

 

In its prayer for relief the Plaintiff requested the Court to enter an order declaring that the Defendant has infringed the ’750 Patent, awarding Plaintiff its damages suffered as a result of Defendant’s infringement of the ’750 Patent, for compensatory damages and costs, and other reliefs as deemed appropriate by the Court. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00675

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rock Creek Networks,LLC

Defendant

Nvidia Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John M. Shumaker

Attorney at Connor Kudlac Lee PLLC

609 Castle Ridge Road, Suite 450

Austin, TX 78746

Cabrach J. Connor

Attorney at Connor Kudlac Lee PLLC

609 Castle Ridge Road, Suite 450

Austin, TX 78746

Defendant Attorney

Katherine Grayce Rubschlager

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1950 University Ave., Suite 430

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nvidia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rubschlager, Katherine) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Nvidia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rubschlager, Katherine) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Nvidia Corporation. (lad) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rock Creek Networks,LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rock Creek Networks,LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit PX-750

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14956903). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Rock Creek Networks,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX-750, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nvidia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rubschlager, Katherine) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Nvidia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rubschlager, Katherine) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Nvidia Corporation. (lad) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rock Creek Networks,LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rock Creek Networks,LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14956903). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Rock Creek Networks,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX-750, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rock Creek Networks, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Nvidia Corporation is a litigant