6:21-CV-00080
01/28/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Patent
Alan D Albright
Rock Creek Networks, LLC
Zyxel Communications Corporation
Cabrach J. Connor
John M. Shumaker
Exhibit PX-750
Civil Cover Sheet
Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC as to Zyxel Communications Corporation. Waiver sent on 2/24/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) Service docs received in this and related cases for Fed Ex delivery. Includes pick up scheduled info. (lad) (Entered: 02/02/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) Summons Issued as to Zyxel Communications Corporation. (lad) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/28/2021) (lad). (Entered: 01/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14423125). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX-750, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
[-] Read Less