This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2021 at 09:26:32 (UTC).

Rock Creek Networks, LLC v. Zyxel Communications Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Rock Creek Networks, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Zyxel Communications Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00080

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rock Creek Networks, LLC

Defendant

Zyxel Communications Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cabrach J. Connor

Attorney at Connor Kudlac Lee PLLC

609 Castle Ridge Road, Suite 450

Austin, TX 78746

John M. Shumaker

Attorney at Connor Kudlac Lee PLLC

609 Castle Ridge Road, Suite 450

Austin, TX 78746

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC as to Zyxel Communications Corporation. Waiver sent on 2/24/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#8

(#8) Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#7

(#7) Service docs received in this and related cases for Fed Ex delivery. Includes pick up scheduled info. (lad) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#6

(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Zyxel Communications Corporation. (lad) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/28/2021) (lad). (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit PX-750

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14423125). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX-750, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC as to Zyxel Communications Corporation. Waiver sent on 2/24/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Service docs received in this and related cases for Fed Ex delivery. Includes pick up scheduled info. (lad) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Zyxel Communications Corporation. (lad) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/28/2021) (lad). (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14423125). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX-750, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZyXEL Communications Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Rock Creek Networks, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Michael Shumaker