This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2021 at 10:26:10 (UTC).

Rock Creek Networks, LLC v. Senao Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Rock Creek Networks, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Senao Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00673

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rock Creek Networks, LLC

Defendant

Senao Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John M. Shumaker

Cabrach J. Connor

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit PX-750

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Returned packet info

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docs received for foreign service via FedEx. Pickup info included.(lad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2021: #1 Returned packet info) (lad). (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Senao Networks, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14956894). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX-750, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less