This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2021 at 09:09:12 (UTC).

Rock Creek Networks, LLC v. Realtek Semiconductor Corp.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Rock Creek Networks, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Realtek Semiconductor Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00081

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rock Creek Networks, LLC

Defendant

Realtek Semiconductor Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cabrach J. Connor

John M. Shumaker

 

Court Documents

#5

#1

1 #1

Exhibit PX-750

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

02/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Service docs received in this and related cases for Fed Ex delivery. Includes pick up scheduled info. (lad) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2021

DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Realtek Semiconductor Corp.. (lad) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14423874). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Rock Creek Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX-750, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less