This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:44:13 (UTC).

Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund et al v. Mainlining America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S U B Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Mainlining America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-06135

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank P. Geraci, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund

Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund

Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund

Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund

Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435

Defendants

Mainlining America, LLC

William A Black

Donald L Felter

Yvonne A Solimine

William A. Black

Donald L. Felter

Yvonne A. Solimine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer A. Clark

Attorney at Blitman & King LLP

Franklin Center, Suite 300, 443 North Franklin Street

Syracuse, NY 13204

Defendant Attorney

Vincent E. Polsinelli

Attorney at Jackson Lewis LLP

677 Broadway, 9Th Floor

Albany, NY 12207

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to William A. Black, Donald L. Felter, Yvonne A. Solimine. (JHF) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#3

(#3) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435, Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund. to #1 Complaint,, Summons Against Mainlining America, LLC filed by Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435, Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund. (Clark, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Mainlining America, LLC. (JHF) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

1 #3

Summons against William A. Black

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435, Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund re #2 Summons Issued, #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, upon Secretary of Labor and Secretary of the Treasury (Clark, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund, Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435. William A. Black served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019; Donald L. Felter served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Clark, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

1 #4

Summons against Donald L. Felter

#9

(#9) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by William A. Black, Donald L. Felter, Mainlining America, LLC, Yvonne A. Solimine. (Polsinelli, Vincent) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3367132, filed by Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund, Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons against Yvonne A. Solimine, #3 Summons against William A. Black, #4 Summons against Donald L. Felter)(Clark, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund, Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435. Mainlining America, LLC served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Clark, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent E. Polsinelli on behalf of William A. Black, Donald L. Felter, Mainlining America, LLC, Yvonne A. Solimine (Polsinelli, Vincent) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

1 #2

Summons against Yvonne A. Solimine

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#11

(#11) STIPULATION re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, Accepting Service of Process and Setting Deadline for Response on Behalf of Yvonne A. Solimine by Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435, Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund. (Clark, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION AND ORDER, Yvonne A. Solimine answer due 4/26/2019. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 4/17/19. (JHF) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION AND ORDER, Yvonne A. Solimine answer due 4/26/2019. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 4/17/19. (JHF) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, Accepting Service of Process and Setting Deadline for Response on Behalf of Yvonne A. Solimine by Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435, Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund. (Clark, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Answer due date updated as to William A. Black answer due 4/26/2019; Donald L. Felter answer due 4/26/2019; Mainlining America, LLC answer due 4/26/2019. (JHF) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • (#10) TEXT ORDER: The Court adopts the Stipulation filed by the parties on March 27, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/28/19. (GMS) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by William A. Black, Donald L. Felter, Mainlining America, LLC, Yvonne A. Solimine. (Polsinelli, Vincent) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent E. Polsinelli on behalf of William A. Black, Donald L. Felter, Mainlining America, LLC, Yvonne A. Solimine (Polsinelli, Vincent) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund, Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435. William A. Black served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019; Donald L. Felter served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Clark, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund, Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435. Mainlining America, LLC served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Clark, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435, Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund re #2 Summons Issued, #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, upon Secretary of Labor and Secretary of the Treasury (Clark, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Mainlining America, LLC. (JHF) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435, Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund. to #1 Complaint,, Summons Against Mainlining America, LLC filed by Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435, Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund. (Clark, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to William A. Black, Donald L. Felter, Yvonne A. Solimine. (JHF) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3367132, filed by Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund, Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons against Yvonne A. Solimine, #3 Summons against William A. Black, #4 Summons against Donald L. Felter)(Clark, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.