This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2020 at 09:23:51 (UTC).

Robles v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Robles filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Dowdell, Frank H McCarthy and Christine D Little. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00480

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E Dowdell

Referral Judges

Frank H McCarthy

Christine D Little

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jonathan Robles

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laura L Hamilton

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Donald Eugene Smolen, II

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

John William Warren

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Defendant Attorneys

Raymond Conrad Purdom, III

Attorney at Atkinson Haskins Nellis Brittingham Gladd & Fiasco

525 S Main Ste 1500

Tulsa, OK 74103-4524

John Scott Gladd

Attorney at Atkinson Haskins Nellis Brittingham Gladd & Fiasco

525 S Main Ste 1500

Tulsa, OK 74103-4524

Jason Andrew Brown

Attorney at Atkinson Haskins Nellis Brittingham Gladd & Fiasco

525 S Main Ste 1500

Tulsa, OK 74103-4524

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Brown, Jason) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Scott Gladd on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney John Scott Gladd added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Gladd, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Andrew Brown on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney Jason Andrew Brown added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Brown, Jason) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Raymond Conrad Purdom, III on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney Raymond Conrad Purdom, III added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Purdom, Raymond) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jonathan Robles (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 10/11/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2274007) by Jonathan Robles (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jonathan Robles (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Brown, Jason) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , vacating/setting aside order(s) (Re: 13 Minute Order,, Recusing Judge,, Changing Case Number, ) (Documents Terminated: 13 Minute Order,, Recusing Judge,, Changing Case Number, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to conflict, recusing Chief Judge John E Dowdell. Judge Gregory K Frizzell reassigned to case., changing case number to 20-cv-480-GKF-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 11/17/2020 - VACATED per 14 (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 20-37, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Christine D Little, Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 20-cv-480-JED-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (a-hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension to Answer and/or Otherwise Plead (Doc. 8) is granted. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint is due November 17, 2020. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 11/17/2020); granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Gladd, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Scott Gladd on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney John Scott Gladd added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Gladd, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Andrew Brown on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney Jason Andrew Brown added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Brown, Jason) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Raymond Conrad Purdom, III on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney Raymond Conrad Purdom, III added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Purdom, Raymond) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jonathan Robles (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 10/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2274007) by Jonathan Robles (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jonathan Robles (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond Conrad Purdom, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Andrew Brown

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Scott Gladd