Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:19:38 (UTC).

Robles v. Sheppard et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Robles filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Sheppard. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05505

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Itollovier Lee Robles

Defendants

McWane, Inc.

Robert Aaron Sheppard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul Benjamin Mazur

Attorney at Paul B. Mazur, P.C.

44 Broad Street, N.W., Suite 600, The Grant Building

Atlanta, GA 30303

John David Hadden

Attorney at Turkheimer & Hadden, LLC

The Grant Building, Suite 600, 44 Broad Street

Atlanta, GA 30303

Lloyd Hoffspiegel

Attorney at Hoffspiegel Law

Bldg 15, 2900 Chamblee Tucker Rd.,

Atlanta, GA 30341

Alexander Sanford Hoffspiegel

Attorney at Hoffspiegel Law

Bldg 15, 2900 Chamblee Tucker Rd.,

Atlanta, GA 30341

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Beane

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

C. Bradford Marsh

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Discovery by Robert Aaron Sheppard.(Marsh, C.) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#16

(#16) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery ends on 8/6/2020. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/29/2020. (jta) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE by Robert Aaron Sheppard Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas for Production of Documents (Marsh, C.) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Discovery by Robert Aaron Sheppard.(Marsh, C.) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE by Robert Aaron Sheppard Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas for Production of Documents (Marsh, C.) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Itollovier Lee Robles.(Hoffspiegel, Alexander) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McWane, Inc., Robert Aaron Sheppard.(Beane, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER re: #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 8/6/2020. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/8/2020. (jta) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

9 #1

Proposed Scheduling Order

#9

(#9) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by McWane, Inc., Robert Aaron Sheppard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Beane, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

(#8) First Certificate of Interested Persons by Itollovier Lee Robles. (Hoffspiegel, Alexander) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Sanford Hoffspiegel on behalf of Itollovier Lee Robles (Hoffspiegel, Alexander) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Sanford Hoffspiegel on behalf of Itollovier Lee Robles (Hoffspiegel, Alexander) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert Aaron Sheppard and McWane, Inc. (jap) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint within #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McWane, Inc. (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 12/10/2019 to correct docket text (jap). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

McWane, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complai

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Robert Aaron Sheppard and McWane, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9156344). (Attachments: #1 Robert Aaron Sheppard's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 McWane, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Discovery by Robert Aaron Sheppard.(Marsh, C.) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery ends on 8/6/2020. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/29/2020. (jta) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Robert Aaron Sheppard Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas for Production of Documents (Marsh, C.) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Discovery by Robert Aaron Sheppard.(Marsh, C.) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by Robert Aaron Sheppard Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas for Production of Documents (Marsh, C.) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Itollovier Lee Robles.(Hoffspiegel, Alexander) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McWane, Inc., Robert Aaron Sheppard.(Beane, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER re: #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 8/6/2020. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/8/2020. (jta) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by McWane, Inc., Robert Aaron Sheppard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Beane, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First Certificate of Interested Persons by Itollovier Lee Robles. (Hoffspiegel, Alexander) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Sanford Hoffspiegel on behalf of Itollovier Lee Robles (Hoffspiegel, Alexander) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Sanford Hoffspiegel on behalf of Itollovier Lee Robles (Hoffspiegel, Alexander) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert Aaron Sheppard and McWane, Inc. (jap) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint within #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McWane, Inc. (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 12/10/2019 to correct docket text (jap). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/8/2019. (bgt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint within #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert Aaron Sheppard. Discovery ends on 5/4/2020. (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 12/10/2019 to correct docket text (jap). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Robert Aaron Sheppard and McWane, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9156344). (Attachments: #1 Robert Aaron Sheppard's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 McWane, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCWANE,INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Benjamin Mazur

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. David Hadden Esq.