This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2019 at 07:30:25 (UTC).

Roblero-Chavez v. Immigration Custom Enforcement (ICE) et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 Roblero-Chavez filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Immigration Custom Enforcement ICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robin L. Rosenberg, Shaniek M. Maynard and Lisette M. Reid. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14344

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

Referral Judges

Shaniek M. Maynard

Lisette M. Reid

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saulo David Roblero-Chavez

Stuart, FL 34994

Defendants

Immigration Custom Enforcement (ICE)

Martin County Sheriff's Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Noticing INS Attorney

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #8 Amended Complaint filed by Saulo David Roblero-Chavez; Recommending that the instant pro se filing be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction and the case CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 11/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#9

(#9) INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 10/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Immigration Custom Enforcement (ICE), filed by Saulo David Roblero-Chavez.(drz) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Saulo David Roblero-Chavez. (drz) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#1

(#1) Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Immigration Custom Enforcement (ICE), Martin County Sheriff's Office. Filing fee $ 400.00 (NOT PAID/NO IFP), filed by Saulo David Roblero-Chavez.(jao) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #8 Amended Complaint filed by Saulo David Roblero-Chavez; Recommending that the instant pro se filing be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction and the case CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 11/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PAPERLESS ORDER denying #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, without prejudice. Petitioner filed his motion to proceed in forma pauperis but failed to submit the supporting statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months for any institutional account in his name in accordance with Rule 3(a) of the Rules Governing 2254 Proceedings in the District Courts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/7/2019. (jgg) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 10/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Immigration Custom Enforcement (ICE), filed by Saulo David Roblero-Chavez.(drz) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Case Reopened per de#7 (dj) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#7) PAPERLESS ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to OPEN THIS CASE. This matter is REFERRED to the Honorable Lisette M. Reid for a ruling on non-dispositive matters and a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • (#6) Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) 2019-2 to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard no longer assigned to case. (Motions referred to Judge Lisette M. Reid.) (jao) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Saulo David Roblero-Chavez. (drz) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • (#4) PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See DE 3. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • (#3) PAPERLESS ORDER. Plaintiff has not paid the filing fee in this case and has not filed a motion for in forma pauperis status. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall either pay the file fee in this case or file a motion for in forma pauperis status by September 27, 2019. In the event Plaintiff does not comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss Plaintiff's case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. (jao) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Immigration Custom Enforcement (ICE), Martin County Sheriff's Office. Filing fee $ 400.00 (NOT PAID/NO IFP), filed by Saulo David Roblero-Chavez.(jao) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant