This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2019 at 07:33:32 (UTC).

Robinson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 Robinson filed an Other lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine P. Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00419

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine P. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jamillah Robinson

Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Octavio Gomez

Attorney at Morgan and Morgan

201 N. Franklin Street

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

James Marion Powell

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

300 North Greene Street, Suite 1900

Greensboro, NC 27401

 

Court Documents

16 #1

consent

#16

(#16) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/5/19. (Attachments: #1 consent) (srr) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Powell, James) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Powell, James) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

11 #1

Exhibit

#11

(#11) MOTION and APPLICATION for James M. Powell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2458541, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Powell, James) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Powell, James) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamillah Robinson. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019 (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Jamillah Robinson of Filing Certificate of Good Standing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 request for reassignment) (srr) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

2 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

2 #1

Additional Page Regarding question 5

#2

(#2) MOTION and APPLICATION for Octavio Gomez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2436217, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Jamillah Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page Regarding question 5, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2436209, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Jamillah Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER on #15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 09/05/2019. (Anthony, Porcha) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/5/19. (Attachments: #1 consent) (srr) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Powell, James) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Powell, James) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on 9/5/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 08/20/2019. (Anthony, Porcha) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 08/20/2019. (Anthony, Porcha) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION and APPLICATION for James M. Powell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2458541, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Powell, James) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Powell, James) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamillah Robinson. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019 (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Octavio Gomez to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the Plaintiff, as supplemented #7 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/26/2019. (ctn) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Jamillah Robinson of Filing Certificate of Good Standing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 request for reassignment) (srr) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Service Notice entered 7/23/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service deadline set to 9/6/2019. (srr) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srr) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order re: #2 MOTION and APPLICATION for Octavio Gomez to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jamillah Robinson, the applicant is to supplement the present motion with a Federal Court certificate of good standing by 8/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/23/19. (srr) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION and APPLICATION for Octavio Gomez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2436217, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Jamillah Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page Regarding question 5, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2436209, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Jamillah Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Gomez, Octavio) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.