This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:32:54 (UTC).

Robinson v. Walmart Inc

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Robinson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carol B Whitehurst and Robert R Summerhays. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01060

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carol B Whitehurst

Presiding Judge

Robert R Summerhays

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Robinson

Defendants

Walmart Inc

Wal-Mart Stores Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kaliste Joseph Saloom, IV

Attorney at Domengeaux Wright et al (LAF)

P O Box 3668

Lafayette, LA 70502-3668

Andrew J Quackenbos

Attorney at Domengeaux Wright et al (LAF)

P O Box 3668

Lafayette, LA 70502-3668

Defendant Attorneys

Donna R Moliere

Attorney at Swift & Rhoades

P O Box 53107

Lafayette, LA 70505-3107

John Goulding Swift

Attorney at Swift & Rhoades

P O Box 53107

Lafayette, LA 70505-3107

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2021 02:00 PM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/15/2020. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/19/2020. Rule 26 Report due by 11/12/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 4/23/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 3/24/2021. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 4/23/2021. Discovery deadline 5/24/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/22/2021. Daubert Motions due by 6/22/2021. Motions in Limine due by 9/20/2021. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 9/20/2021. Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2021. Bench Books due by 10/6/2021. Trial Depositions due by 10/6/2021. Real Time glossary due by 10/13/2021. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 10/13/2021.. Signed by Paula S. Jordan on 9/24/2020. (crt,Jordan, P) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

6 #12

Notice of Removal

6 #11

Notice of Depo

6 #10

Clerk's Notice of Service

6 #9

State court return of service

6 #8

State court notice of filing Answer, Req for Notice of Walmart

6 #7

State court citation

6 #6

Clerk's Fax Confirmation

6 #5

Louisiana Civil Case Cover Sheet

6 #4

Interrogatories/Req for Production

6 #3

State court petition

6 #2

Affidavit Deputy Clerk

6 #1

Affidavit John Swift/Walmart

#6

(#6) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Walmart Inc . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John Swift/Walmart, #2 Affidavit Deputy Clerk, #3 State court petition, #4 Interrogatories/Req for Production, #5 Louisiana Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Clerk's Fax Confirmation, #7 State court citation, #8 State court notice of filing Answer, Req for Notice of Walmart, #9 State court return of service, #10 Clerk's Notice of Service, #11 Notice of Depo, #12 Notice of Removal)(aty,Swift, John) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit Walmart/Edwards

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit Walmart/Edwards)(aty,Swift, John) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#4

(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/18/2020. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/17/2020. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2021 02:00 PM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/15/2020. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/19/2020. Rule 26 Report due by 11/12/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 4/23/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 3/24/2021. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 4/23/2021. Discovery deadline 5/24/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/22/2021. Daubert Motions due by 6/22/2021. Motions in Limine due by 9/20/2021. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 9/20/2021. Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2021. Bench Books due by 10/6/2021. Trial Depositions due by 10/6/2021. Real Time glossary due by 10/13/2021. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 10/13/2021.. Signed by Paula S. Jordan on 9/24/2020. (crt,Jordan, P) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart Inc. (16th JDC, Parish of St Mary, #134,761, filed 5/26/2020). ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF can found in Attachment #8 in Document #6, Response to Removal Order.(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Walmart Inc answer due 5/20/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF can be found in Attachment #9 found in Document #6, Response to Removal Order. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Walmart Inc . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John Swift/Walmart, #2 Affidavit Deputy Clerk, #3 State court petition, #4 Interrogatories/Req for Production, #5 Louisiana Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Clerk's Fax Confirmation, #7 State court citation, #8 State court notice of filing Answer, Req for Notice of Walmart, #9 State court return of service, #10 Clerk's Notice of Service, #11 Notice of Depo, #12 Notice of Removal)(aty,Swift, John) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit Walmart/Edwards)(aty,Swift, John) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 8/18/2020. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/17/2020. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to John Goulding Swift on behalf of Walmart Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/31/2020. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC St Mary Parish, Case Number 134761 A with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4359021) filed by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 State court petition Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C - Answers to Inter, #4 Exhibit D - Medical Records, #5 Exhibit E - Medical Expense Itemization, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Walmart, Edwards, #7 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John Goulding Swift added to party Walmart Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Swift, John) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less