This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:26:33 (UTC).

Robinson v. USA

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Robinson filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John R. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02837

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Adams

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jay J. Robinson

Bruceton Mills, WV 26525

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Carmen E. Henderson

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Motion pursuant to 28 USC 2255 to correct sentence by a person in federal custody. Filed by Jay J. Robinson. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (O,K) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

envelope

#2

(#2) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (O,K) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlease refer to Criminal Case Number 5:15cr125 for all further entries pertaining to Jay Robinson's 2255 motion. Related document(s) #1 . (O,K) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of #2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order and #1 Motion Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 mailed to Jay J. Robinson #60856-060 at USP Hazelton, U.S. Penitentiary, P.O. Box 2000, Bruceton Mills, WV 2652 on 12/6/2019. (O,K) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (O,K) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Motion pursuant to 28 USC 2255 to correct sentence by a person in federal custody. Filed by Jay J. Robinson. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (O,K) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.