This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2019 at 09:03:21 (UTC).

ROBINSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 ROBINSON filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katharine S. Hayden. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-19399

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katharine S. Hayden

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROOSEVELT ROBINSON

Bruceton Mills, WV 26525

Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

JOHN GAY

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, Suite 700

Newark, NJ 07102

ANDREW MARK TROMBLY

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, DISTRICT OF NJ

970 Broad Street

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Clerk of the Court shall administratively terminate this case. If Petitioner wishes to reopen this case, he shall so notify the Court in writing within 30 days of the date of entry of this Memorandum and Order, etc. (Memorandum and Order and blank 2255 form mailed to Petitioner). Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 12/9/19. (jc, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW MARK TROMBLY on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (TROMBLY, ANDREW) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 16-cr-00444-KSH, filed by ROOSEVELT ROBINSON.(ld, ) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • ***Civil Case Terminated. (jc, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Clerk of the Court shall administratively terminate this case. If Petitioner wishes to reopen this case, he shall so notify the Court in writing within 30 days of the date of entry of this Memorandum and Order, etc. (Memorandum and Order and blank 2255 form mailed to Petitioner). Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 12/9/19. (jc, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW MARK TROMBLY on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (TROMBLY, ANDREW) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 16-cr-00444-KSH, filed by ROOSEVELT ROBINSON.(ld, ) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.