This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:26:38 (UTC).

Robinson v. State of South Carolina

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Robinson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against State of South Carolina. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce Howe Hendricks, Jacquelyn D Austin and Sherri A Lydon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-03397

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacquelyn D Austin

Presiding Judges

Bruce Howe Hendricks

Sherri A Lydon

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Franklin Robinson

Terre Haute, IN 47808

Franklin M Robinson

Terre Haute, IN 47808

Respondent

State of South Carolina

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Franklin Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gpre, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Case to be brought into proper form by 1/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 12/12/2019. (gpre, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#9

(#9) SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 1/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 1/8/2020. (gpre, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Franklin Robinson. Response to Motion due by 2/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Inquiry, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, ) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Docket(#11) Case Reassigned to Judge Sherri A Lydon. Judge Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Proper Form Order, ao240 Application, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Franklin Robinson 21986-171 United States Penitentiary PO Box 33 Terre Haute, IN 47808 (gpre, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 1/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 1/8/2020. (gpre, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, #1 Petition, AO240 Application, 2254 Habeas form, 2241 Habeas form, 2255 Habeas form, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Franklin Robinson 21986-171 United States Penitentiary PO Box 33 Terre Haute, IN 47808 (gpre, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Case to be brought into proper form by 1/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 12/12/2019. (gpre, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (gpre, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Franklin Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gpre, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.