This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2020 at 09:46:59 (UTC).

Robinson v. St Jude Children's Research Hospital, Inc

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Robinson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against St Jude Children's Research Hospital, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and John T. Fowlkes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02768

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

John T. Fowlkes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TN Geraldine Robinson

Defendant

St Jude Children's Research Hospital, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Darrell J. O'Neal

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DARRELL J. O'NEAL

2129 Winchester Road

Memphis, TN 38116

Defendant Attorney

Lisa A. Krupicka

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by St Jude Children's Research Hospital, Inc.(Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Robyn Diaz. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#2

(#2) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit Ex. 2, Robinson Right to Sue

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. 1, Robinson charge ltr

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against St Jude Children's Research Hospital, Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3464901), filed by Geraldine Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1, Robinson charge ltr, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2, Robinson Right to Sue)(O'Neal, Darrell) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by St Jude Children's Research Hospital, Inc.(Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Robyn Diaz. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against St Jude Children's Research Hospital, Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3464901), filed by Geraldine Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1, Robinson charge ltr, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2, Robinson Right to Sue)(O'Neal, Darrell) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST JUDE CHILDRENS RESEARCH HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa A. Krupicka