This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/02/2020 at 09:29:25 (UTC).

Robinson v. Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Robinson filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara M. G. Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02767

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara M. G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodrione Robinson

Defendants

Progressive Rehab Solutions, LLC

Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jamie Jean Gilmore

Attorney at Bailey & Galyen

1300 Summit Avenue, Suite 650

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Brittney Lynne Thompson

Attorney at Bailey & Galyen

1300 Summit Avenue, Suite 650, 817-27-6000

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant Attorneys

Renee L Harris

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

Gavin S Martinson

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for three-week docket beginning 1/18/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 7/19/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 8/23/2021. Motions due by 9/27/2021. Discovery due by 8/27/2021. Settlement Status Report due by 8/23/2021. Pretrial Order due by 12/27/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 12/27/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/23/2020) (jmg) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#10

(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. (Martinson, Gavin) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/23/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/2/2020) (axm) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Renee L Harris on behalf of Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Harris, Renee) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. (Martinson, Gavin) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Gavin S Martinson added to party Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC (pty:dft). (Martinson, Gavin) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC ; served on 9/10/2020. (Gilmore, Jamie) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. (oyh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rodrione Robinson. (Gilmore, Jamie) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Progressive Rehab Solutions, LLC filed by Rodrione Robinson. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11142170) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Gilmore, Jamie) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for three-week docket beginning 1/18/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 7/19/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 8/23/2021. Motions due by 9/27/2021. Discovery due by 8/27/2021. Settlement Status Report due by 8/23/2021. Pretrial Order due by 12/27/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 12/27/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/23/2020) (jmg) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. (Martinson, Gavin) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/23/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/2/2020) (axm) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Renee L Harris on behalf of Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Harris, Renee) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. (Martinson, Gavin) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Gavin S Martinson added to party Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC (pty:dft). (Martinson, Gavin) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC ; served on 9/10/2020. (Gilmore, Jamie) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Progressive Rehab Solutions LLC. (oyh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rodrione Robinson. (Gilmore, Jamie) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Progressive Rehab Solutions, LLC filed by Rodrione Robinson. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11142170) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Gilmore, Jamie) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Renee L Harris

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gavin S Martinson