This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/20/2020 at 10:11:03 (UTC).

Robinson v. Geico General Insurance et al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 Robinson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Geico General Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Barlow. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00328

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Barlow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sean Robinson

Defendants

Geico General Insurance

Geico Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael L. Banks

Attorney at ADAMS DAVIS PC

35 W Broadway Ste 203

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Defendant Attorneys

Peter H. Christensen

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Marshall J. Hendrickson

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit Complaint and Summons

2 #3

Exhibit Notice of Filling for Removal

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per Stipulation #5 . (jrj) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION To Arbitration Agreement by Geico Casualty Company. (Hendrickson, Marshall) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Geico Casualty Company. (Hendrickson, Marshall) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance, Plaintiff Sean Robinson. (kn) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake Couty, case number 200903096, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3583409) filed by Geico Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint and Summons, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filling for Removal) Assigned to Judge David Barlow (Hendrickson, Marshall) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Barlow. Defendants Geico Casualty Company, Geico General Insurance is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (kn) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter H Christensen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marshall J. Hendrickson