This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2022 at 08:16:49 (UTC).

Robinson v. Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Office of Attorney General

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 Robinson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Office of Attorney General. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher C. Conner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01704

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher C. Conner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anita Robinson

Defendant

Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Office of Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew S. Abramson

Defendant Attorney

Daniel P McGannon

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exh. A

1 #2

Exh. B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/28/2022. (mw) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Office of Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McGannon, Daniel) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

3 #1

Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2023 at 02:00 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. At least five days before the conference,counsel shall file their joint case management plan with the court. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(mw) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

4 #1

Term. Calendar

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2023 at 02:00 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. At least five days before the conference,counsel shall file their joint case management plan with the court. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(mw) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Office of Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McGannon, Daniel) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/28/2022. (mw) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Office of Attorney General from Dauphin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CV-7391-CVf. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-6100469H), filed by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Office of Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A, #2 Exh. B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less