Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2019 at 08:05:28 (UTC).

Robinson v. Baker et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 Robinson filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Baker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Jane Triche Milazzo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-12219

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Robinson

Defendants

Floyd Baker

Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.

Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dale Edward Williams

Attorney at Law Office of Dale Edward Williams

212 Park Place

Covington, LA 70433

Chad A. Danenhower

Attorney at Danenhower Law Firm, LLC

212 Park Pl.

Covington, LA 70433

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Summons

#13

(#13) Request of Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/5/2019) (am). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#12

(#12) Request of Summons Issued as to Floyd Baker filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/5/2019) (am). Modified text on 9/5/2019 (am). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#11

(#11) **DEFICIENT**Request of Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) Modified text on 9/5/2019 (am). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#10

(#10) **DEFICIENT**Request of Summons Issued as to Floyd Baker filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) Modified text on 9/5/2019 (am). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#9

(#9) **DEFICIENT**Request of Summons Issued as to Floyd Baker filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) Modified text on 9/4/2019 (am). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#8

(#8) **DEFICIENT**Request of Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/4/2019) (am). Modified on 9/4/2019 (am). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Judge Wendy B Vitter no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 8/30/2019.(jeg) (NEF: Sections D and H) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

5 #2

Page 2 of Summons

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc., Floyd Baker. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Page 2 of Summons)(jeg) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#4

(#4) Request of Summons Issued as to Floyd Baker filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#3

(#3) Request of Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7812192) filed by Antonio Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Dale Edward Williams added to party Antonio Robinson(pty:pla).(Williams, Dale) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 Request for Summons Issued, #13 Request for Summons Issued.** Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section H.** (am) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc, Floyd Baker. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Request of Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/5/2019) (am). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Request of Summons Issued as to Floyd Baker filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/5/2019) (am). Modified text on 9/5/2019 (am). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) **DEFICIENT**Request of Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) Modified text on 9/5/2019 (am). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) **DEFICIENT**Request of Summons Issued as to Floyd Baker filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) Modified text on 9/5/2019 (am). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) **DEFICIENT**Request of Summons Issued as to Floyd Baker filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) Modified text on 9/4/2019 (am). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) **DEFICIENT**Request of Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/4/2019) (am). Modified on 9/4/2019 (am). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Judge Wendy B Vitter no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 8/30/2019.(jeg) (NEF: Sections D and H) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Request for Summons Issued, #4 Request for Summons Issued. **Filing attorney did not include page 2 of summons form. Clerk issued summons and attached a copy of page 2 of form. Please upload complete form on future summons requests.** (jeg) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc., Floyd Baker. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Page 2 of Summons)(jeg) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request of Summons Issued as to Floyd Baker filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request of Summons Issued as to Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. filed by Antonio Robinson re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Dale) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7812192) filed by Antonio Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Dale Edward Williams added to party Antonio Robinson(pty:pla).(Williams, Dale) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASSOCIATED WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chad A. Danenhower

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dale Edward Williams Esq.