This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2021 at 09:07:46 (UTC).

Robin v. Allied Insurance Company of America et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Robin filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allied Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas L Rayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00334

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas L Rayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Robin

Defendants

Allied Insurance Company of America

Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance NAIC, a foreign corporation doing business as Nationwide

Unknown Parties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abdoukadir Abdul Jaiteh

Elizabeth Marie Gonzalez

Defendant Attorneys

William George Caravetta

John M DiCaro

 

Court Documents

11 #4

Text of Proposed Order

11 #3

Exhibit C

11 #2

Exhibit B

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

#10

8 #4

Text of Proposed Order

8 #3

Exhibit Arb. Certificate

8 #2

Exhibit Copy of Check

8 #1

Exhibit Proof of Loss

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Corporate Disclosure

#2

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #11 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Christopher Robin. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re: #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Christopher Robin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re: #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Allied Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance. (DiCaro, John) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Christopher Robin. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) *First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Christopher Robin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Loss, #2 Exhibit Copy of Check, #3 Exhibit Arb. Certificate, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation on 3/30/2021 (SST). (Entered: 03/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Allied Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance.(Caravetta, William) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 5/11/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/25/2021. (RMV) *Modified to correct typo in docket text on 3/2/2021 (RMV). (Entered: 02/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/25/2021. (RMV) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19198004. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00334-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2021

Docket***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 02/16/2021 to Allied Insurance Company of America and Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 02/16/2021). (SCA) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 02/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Allied Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance. (Caravetta, William) (SCA) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance. (Caravetta, William) (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure)(SCA) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-056137. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19198004 filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance, Allied Insurance Company of America. (Caravetta, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(SCA) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less