This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:58:46 (UTC).

Robinson v. 7C Diamonds, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Robinson filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against 7C Diamonds, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey A. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01925

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey A. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sarah Robinson

Defendant

7C Diamonds, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emanuele Robert Cicchiello

Attorney at Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP

364 Franklin Avenue

Hartford, CT 06114

Megan Leigh Michaud

Attorney at Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP

364 Franklin Avenue

Hartford, CT 06114

Defendant Attorneys

Kristi Marie Gardner

Attorney at Nuebert Pepe Monteith P.C.

750 Main Street, Suite 1600

Hartford, CT 06415

Beverly Knapp Anderson

Attorney at Neubert Pepe Monteith P.C.

750 Main Street, Suite 1600

Hartford, CT 06103

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7C Diamonds, Inc.. (Gardner, Kristi) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time until February 22, 2020 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 7C Diamonds, Inc.. (Gardner, Kristi) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Marie Gardner on behalf of 7C Diamonds, Inc. (Gardner, Kristi) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Beverly Knapp Anderson on behalf of 7C Diamonds, Inc. (Knapp Anderson, Beverly) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Robinson. 7C Diamonds, Inc. served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Cicchiello, Emanuele) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *7C Diamonds, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Emanuele Robert Cicchiello* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Sarah Robinson, #5 Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Sarah Robinson. Signed by Clerk on 12/10/2019.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/6/2019.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/6/2019.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2020; Discovery due by 6/6/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 7/11/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Sarah Robinson (Cicchiello, Emanuele) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 7C Diamonds, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5579933.), filed by Sarah Robinson.(Michaud, Megan) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7C Diamonds, Inc.. (Gardner, Kristi) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for 7C Diamonds, Inc. to 2/22/2020. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 22, 2020 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/13/2020. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/24/2020. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time until February 22, 2020 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 7C Diamonds, Inc.. (Gardner, Kristi) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Marie Gardner on behalf of 7C Diamonds, Inc. (Gardner, Kristi) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Beverly Knapp Anderson on behalf of 7C Diamonds, Inc. (Knapp Anderson, Beverly) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Robinson. 7C Diamonds, Inc. served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Cicchiello, Emanuele) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *7C Diamonds, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Emanuele Robert Cicchiello* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Sarah Robinson, #5 Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Sarah Robinson. Signed by Clerk on 12/10/2019.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/6/2019.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/6/2019.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2020; Discovery due by 6/6/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 7/11/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Sarah Robinson (Cicchiello, Emanuele) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to 7C Diamonds, Inc.. (Michaud, Megan) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 7C Diamonds, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5579933.), filed by Sarah Robinson.(Michaud, Megan) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less