This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2019 at 08:12:31 (UTC).

Robinette v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Robinette filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Zurich American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John T. Copenhaver, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00688

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John T. Copenhaver, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Robinette

Defendants

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Zurich American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua R. Martin

Attorney at THE MARTIN LAW FIRM

Suite C, 1901 19Th Street

Nitro, WV 25143

Defendant Attorneys

R. Carter Elkins

Attorney at ELKINS RAY

P. O. Box 730

Huntington, WV 25711-0730

Laura L. Gray

Attorney at ELKINS RAY

P. O. Box 730

Huntington, WV 25711-0730

Gordon Lee Mowen, II

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Tiffany R. Durst

Attorney at PULLIN FOWLER FLANAGAN BROWN & POE

2414 Cranberry Square

Morgantown, WV 26508

Kelly Calder Mowen

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO

99 Cracker Barrel Drive

Barboursville, WV 25504

Edward A. Smallwood

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO

420 Fort Duquesne Boulevard, Suite 600, One Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Robinette for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures. (Martin, Joshua) (Modified on 11/18/2019 to remove disclosures filed in their entirety and retain certificate of service) (kew).

#11

(#11) ORDER: directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: Plaintiff's joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 12/2/2019. Defendant's joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings due by 12/30/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 4/7/2020. Discovery to close by 5/22/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 3/23/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 4/22/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 5/8/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 6/11/2020. Responses due by 6/25/2020. Replies due by 7/2/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 8/12/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 8/19/2020, with responses due by 8/26/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 8/17/2020. Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 8/24/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2020 01:30 PM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 9/23/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 1:30 PM on 9/28/2020 in Charleston. Trial set for 9/29/2020 at 9:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 11/5/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)

#10

(#10) RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Zurich American Insurance Company, Donald Robinette, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Durst, Tiffany) (Modified on 11/7/2019 to add party filers) (kew).

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference; the Scheduling Conference is continued to 11/22/2019 at 11:30 a.m. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 11/1/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION by Zurich American Insurance Company to Continue Scheduling Conference (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Durst, Tiffany)

#7

(#7) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Elkins, R.)

#6

(#6) CONSENT FOR REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Elkins, R.)

#5

(#5) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/16/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/28/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/4/2019. Scheduling Conference at 11:00 AM on 11/15/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/18/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/25/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 9/26/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zurich American Insurance Company with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7388520. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #12 Certificate of Service. ERROR: Disclosures filed in their entirety. CORRECTION: Disclosures removed and certificate of service retained. (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Robinette for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures. (Martin, Joshua) (Modified on 11/18/2019 to remove disclosures filed in their entirety and retain certificate of service) (kew).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER: directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: Plaintiff's joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 12/2/2019. Defendant's joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings due by 12/30/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 4/7/2020. Discovery to close by 5/22/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 3/23/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 4/22/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 5/8/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 6/11/2020. Responses due by 6/25/2020. Replies due by 7/2/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 8/12/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 8/19/2020, with responses due by 8/26/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 8/17/2020. Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 8/24/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2020 01:30 PM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 9/23/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 1:30 PM on 9/28/2020 in Charleston. Trial set for 9/29/2020 at 9:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 11/5/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Zurich American Insurance Company, Donald Robinette, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Durst, Tiffany) (Modified on 11/7/2019 to add party filers) (kew).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference; the Scheduling Conference is continued to 11/22/2019 at 11:30 a.m. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 11/1/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION by Zurich American Insurance Company to Continue Scheduling Conference (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Durst, Tiffany)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Elkins, R.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT FOR REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Elkins, R.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/16/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/28/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/4/2019. Scheduling Conference at 11:00 AM on 11/15/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/18/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/25/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 9/26/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company (Smallwood, Edward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Mowen, Kelly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zurich American Insurance Company with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7388520. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zurich American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua R. Martin