This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/08/2022 at 07:41:50 (UTC).

Robin Williams Trust v. Pandora Media, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 Robin Williams Trust filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Pandora Media, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha, Jacqueline Chooljian, Mark C. Scarsi and Margo A. Rocconi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00815

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judges

Jacqueline Chooljian

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robin Williams Trust

Defendant

Pandora Media, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Steven Busch

Attorney at King and Ballow

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Paul M. Fakler

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020-1001

John Nadolenco

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

350 South Grand Avenue 25Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASESThe Court ordered the parties to show cause why it should not join thefollowing cases: Yellow Rose Productions, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00809- MCS-MAR ; Main Sequence, LTDv. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00810-MCS-MAR; Ron White, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00813-MCS-MAR ; Robin Williams Trustv. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00815-MCS-MA; Brave Lion, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00817-MAR. The plaintiffs to these actions responded that joinder under Rule 20(a)(1) was inappropriate and instead requested consolidation for all pretrial matters. See, e.g., Resp. to OSC, ECF No. 13, Yellow Rose Prods., No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR. The Court discharges the OSC and consolidates the cases for all pretrial matters/ For the same reasons as above, on its own motion the Court also consolidatesthese cases with the following case: Nick Di Paolo v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-01345-MCS-MAR. The Court orders the following: (1) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a), Yellow Rose Productions, Inc. v. PandoraMedia, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR, Main Sequence, LTD v. PandoraMedia, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00810-MCS-MAR, Ron White, Inc. v. Pandora Media,LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00813-MCS-MAR, Robin Williams Trust v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00815-MCS-MAR, Brave Lion, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22- cv-00817-MCS-MAR, and Nick Di Paolo v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv- 01345-MCS-MAR, are consolidated for pretrial purposes and should be captioned (3) Within seven days of this order, Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated complaint in the master file. Defendants response to the consolidated complaint shall be due under the timelines dictated by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules.(SEE DOCUMENT FOR REQUIRED CAPTION AS ORDERED HERE (2) The file in Case No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR shall constitute the master file for every action in the consolidated action. The Clerk shall administratively close the other actions. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#22

(#22) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul M. Fakler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pandora Media, LLC and designating John Nadolenco as local counsel #21 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

21 #1

Proposed Order

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#20) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pandora Media, LLC identifying Sirius XM Radio Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Nadolenco, John) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#19

(#19) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pandora Media, LLC answer now due 4/7/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Pandora Media, LLC.(Attorney John Nadolenco added to party Pandora Media, LLC(pty:dft))(Nadolenco, John) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

18 #2

Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Response to OSC re Joinder

18 #1

Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Response to OSC re Joinder

#15

(#15) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE JOINDER. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the following cases should not be joined under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 20(a)(l ): Yellow Rose Productions, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR; Main Sequence, LTD v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00810-MCS-MAR; Ron White, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00813-MCS-MAR; Robin Williams Trustv. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00815-MCS-MAR; Brave Lion, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00817-MCS-MAR. Plaintiff shall either explain why the cases should not be joined as a single action or consent to joinder. Plaintiff shall respond within seven days of this order. (lc) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (car) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Robin Williams Trust, (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Robin Williams Trust. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASESThe Court ordered the parties to show cause why it should not join thefollowing cases: Yellow Rose Productions, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00809- MCS-MAR ; Main Sequence, LTDv. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00810-MCS-MAR; Ron White, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00813-MCS-MAR ; Robin Williams Trustv. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00815-MCS-MA; Brave Lion, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00817-MAR. The plaintiffs to these actions responded that joinder under Rule 20(a)(1) was inappropriate and instead requested consolidation for all pretrial matters. See, e.g., Resp. to OSC, ECF No. 13, Yellow Rose Prods., No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR. The Court discharges the OSC and consolidates the cases for all pretrial matters/ For the same reasons as above, on its own motion the Court also consolidatesthese cases with the following case: Nick Di Paolo v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-01345-MCS-MAR. The Court orders the following: (1) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a), Yellow Rose Productions, Inc. v. PandoraMedia, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR, Main Sequence, LTD v. PandoraMedia, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00810-MCS-MAR, Ron White, Inc. v. Pandora Media,LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00813-MCS-MAR, Robin Williams Trust v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00815-MCS-MAR, Brave Lion, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22- cv-00817-MCS-MAR, and Nick Di Paolo v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv- 01345-MCS-MAR, are consolidated for pretrial purposes and should be captioned (3) Within seven days of this order, Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated complaint in the master file. Defendants response to the consolidated complaint shall be due under the timelines dictated by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules.(SEE DOCUMENT FOR REQUIRED CAPTION AS ORDERED HERE (2) The file in Case No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR shall constitute the master file for every action in the consolidated action. The Clerk shall administratively close the other actions. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul M. Fakler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pandora Media, LLC and designating John Nadolenco as local counsel #21 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul M. Fakler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pandora Media, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32864939) filed by Defendant Pandora Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nadolenco, John) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pandora Media, LLC identifying Sirius XM Radio Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Nadolenco, John) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pandora Media, LLC answer now due 4/7/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Pandora Media, LLC.(Attorney John Nadolenco added to party Pandora Media, LLC(pty:dft))(Nadolenco, John) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Robin Williams Trustto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #15 [Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause Re: Joinder] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Response to OSC re Joinder, #2 Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Response to OSC re Joinder)(Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robin Williams Trust, upon Defendant Pandora Media, LLC served on 2/15/2022, answer due 3/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Pandora Media, LLC. (lc) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE JOINDER. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the following cases should not be joined under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 20(a)(l ): Yellow Rose Productions, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00809-MCS-MAR; Main Sequence, LTD v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00810-MCS-MAR; Ron White, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00813-MCS-MAR; Robin Williams Trustv. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00815-MCS-MAR; Brave Lion, Inc. v. Pandora Media, LLC, No. 2:22-cv-00817-MCS-MAR. Plaintiff shall either explain why the cases should not be joined as a single action or consent to joinder. Plaintiff shall respond within seven days of this order. (lc) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robin Williams Trust. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robin Williams Trust. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Robin Williams Trust. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (car) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Robin Williams Trust, (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Robin Williams Trust. (Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32746424 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Robin Williams Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Richard Steven Busch added to party Robin Williams Trust(pty:pla))(Busch, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pandora Media, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul M. Fakler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Nadolenco